Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 572 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3715 Week
» 13885 Month
» 291681 Year
» 1176062 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1719 m/e 08/1918
LNER (1924) 6537   31/10/1925
War Dept. 748   19/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
Order Number L926
Works Number 1262
To Service During 08/1918
Taken into Stock 31/10/1925
Withdrawal Fri 19/09/1941 off Langwith Junction (LNG)
Service Life 23 yrs, 1 mth , 19 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 748 and sent to the Middle East via Ellesmere Port, 17/10/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 29/10/1925
WFD Woodford Halse 13/11/1925
DON Doncaster 25/09/1928
WFD Woodford Halse 29/11/1928
LNG Langwith Junction 27/09/1930
   Withdrawn 19/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1057)
19/07/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1692)
26/03/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 931)
10/11/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1016)
12/12/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3267)
18/03/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1201)
20/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3444)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 18/07/1925 31/10/1925 106 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6537
 
Gorton Works 28/01/1928 10/03/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 28/06/1930 19/07/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1692 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1932 26/03/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 931 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/11/1934 10/11/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1936 12/12/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 3267 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1939 18/03/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1201 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1941 20/09/1941 13 days General
Boiler number 3444 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 748
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1719
Built at Nasmyth Wilson, Works Number 1262
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
18/07/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1925. Dep: 31/10/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6537
   
29/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
31/10/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
13/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
28/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1928. Dep: 10/03/1928.    
25/09/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
29/11/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
28/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1930. Dep: 19/07/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1692 (Diagram 15)
   
27/09/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
19/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1932. Dep: 26/03/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 931 (Diagram 15)
   
03/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1934. Dep: 10/11/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15)
   
28/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1936. Dep: 12/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3267 (Diagram 15)
   
04/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1939. Dep: 18/03/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1201 (Diagram 15)
   
08/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3444 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 748
   
19/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 748 from Langwith Junction (LNG)    

prev prev