Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 17475 Month
» 295271 Year
» 1179652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1721 m/e 10/1918
LNER (1924) 6376   16/02/1924
LNER (1946) 3636   08/12/1946
BR 63636 w/e 24/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/310/1918
O4/828/12/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
Order Number L926
Works Number 1264
To Service During 10/1918
Taken into Stock 16/02/1924
Withdrawal Sun 20/12/1964 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 46 yrs, 2 mths , 20 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 2/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 23/02/1924
LNG Langwith Junction 17/06/1945
CLK Colwick 27/10/1946
ANN Annesley 30/03/1947
CLK Colwick 29/06/1947
40E Langwith Junction 11/05/1952
   Withdrawn 20/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 05/04/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick 29/06/1947
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 17/05/1952
WDN   20/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1206)
21/08/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1329)
18/06/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1468)
23/06/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 924)
23/09/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 870)
28/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 863)
05/12/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3268)
13/05/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1023)
03/05/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1237)
27/11/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 853)
11/05/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3299)
28/07/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1131)
06/01/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22152)
21/02/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22141)
21/05/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22225)
28/12/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28942)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 09/02/1924 16/02/1924 8 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6376
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1924 21/08/1924 81 days General
Boiler number 1329 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1927 20/04/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 20/04/1929 18/06/1929 60 days General
Boiler number 1468 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/05/1931 23/06/1931 53 days General
Boiler number 924 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1933 23/09/1933 37 days General
Boiler number 870 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/05/1935 28/06/1935 54 days General
Boiler number 863 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1935 13/07/1935 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 13/11/1936 05/12/1936 23 days General
Boiler number 3268 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/04/1939 13/05/1939 41 days General
Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/03/1941 03/05/1941 42 days General
Boiler number 1237 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/09/1941 13/09/1941 2 days Special
Examined for the War Department
 
Gorton Works 14/11/1943 27/11/1943 14 days General
Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/03/1946 11/05/1946 50 days General
Boiler number 3299 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1948 28/07/1948 50 days General
Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63636
 
Gorton Works 05/12/1950 06/01/1951 33 days General
Boiler number 22152 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/01/1951 13/01/1951 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 02/02/1953 21/02/1953 20 days General
Boiler number 22141 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/03/1955 21/05/1955 72 days General
Boiler number 22225 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/10/1957 28/12/1957 72 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28942 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 01/07/1958 09/07/1958 9 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 13/09/1958 27/09/1958 15 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 25/07/1961 25/08/1961 32 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1721
Built at Nasmyth Wilson, Works Number 1264
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 16/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6376
   
16/02/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
23/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
02/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1924. Dep: 21/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1329 (Diagram 15)
   
09/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1927. Dep: 20/04/1927.    
20/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1929. Dep: 18/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1468 (Diagram 15)
   
02/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1931. Dep: 23/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 924 (Diagram 15)
   
18/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1933. Dep: 23/09/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 870 (Diagram 15)
   
06/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1935. Dep: 28/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 863 (Diagram 15)
   
06/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/07/1935. Dep: 13/07/1935.    
13/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1936. Dep: 05/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3268 (Diagram 15)
   
03/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1939. Dep: 13/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15)
   
23/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1941. Dep: 03/05/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1237 (Diagram 15)
   
12/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Special) - Arr: 12/09/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Examined for the War Department
   
14/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1943. Dep: 27/11/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15)
   
17/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
23/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1946. Dep: 11/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3299 (Diagram 15)
   
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
08/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3636    
30/03/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
29/06/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
09/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1948. Dep: 28/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63636
   
05/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1950. Dep: 06/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22152 (Diagram 15)
   
10/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/01/1951. Dep: 13/01/1951.    
11/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
02/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1953. Dep: 21/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22141 (Diagram 15)
   
11/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1955. Dep: 21/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22225 (Diagram 15)
   
18/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1957. Dep: 28/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28942 (Diagram 100A)
   
01/07/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/07/1958. Dep: 09/07/1958.    
13/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/09/1958. Dep: 27/09/1958.    
25/07/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/07/1961. Dep: 25/08/1961.    
20/12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63636 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev