|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 10/03/1928 | 28/04/1928 | 50 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6558 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1930 | 03/05/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1932 | 12/03/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1935 | 05/10/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3212 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1938 | 30/04/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1237 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1940 | 23/11/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3298 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1943 | 06/03/1943 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/04/1945 | 28/04/1945 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3381 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1947 | 05/07/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1949 | 30/07/1949 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3224 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63637 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/12/1951 | 29/12/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22234 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1951 | 04/01/1952 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 22/05/1954 | 12/06/1954 | 22 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1954 | 18/06/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1956 | 12/01/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22202 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/01/1957 | 25/01/1957 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 02/04/1960 | 21/05/1960 | 50 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 11/06/1960 | 18/06/1960 | 8 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1722 Built at Nasmyth Wilson, Works Number 1265 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
10/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1928. Dep: 28/04/1928. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6558 |
||
03/05/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
03/05/1928 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
22/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1930. Dep: 03/05/1930. | ||
05/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1932. Dep: 12/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/09/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
21/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1935. Dep: 05/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3212 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1938. Dep: 30/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1237 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/01/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
09/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1940. Dep: 23/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3298 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1943. Dep: 06/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1945. Dep: 28/04/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3381 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3637 | ||
07/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1947. Dep: 05/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1949. Dep: 30/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3224 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63637 |
||
08/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1951. Dep: 29/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22234 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/12/1951. Dep: 04/01/1952. | ||
22/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 22/05/1954. Dep: 12/06/1954. | ||
15/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/06/1954. Dep: 18/06/1954. | ||
15/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1956. Dep: 12/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22202 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/01/1957. Dep: 25/01/1957. | ||
02/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/04/1960. Dep: 21/05/1960. | ||
11/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1960. Dep: 18/06/1960. | ||
09/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63637 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |