Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 77 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7531 Week
» 10113 Month
» 274746 Year
» 1496311 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1724 m/e 10/1918
LNER (1924) 6559   18/04/1929
LNER (1946) 3639   18/01/1947
BR 63639 w/e 20/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/310/1918
O4/811/12/1954
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
Order Number L926
Works Number 1267
To Service During 10/1918
Taken into Stock 18/04/1929
Withdrawal Sun 19/12/1965 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 47 yrs, 2 mths , 19 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to J Cashmore, Great Bridge, 2/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1918
DON Doncaster on 18/04/1929
MEX Mexborough on 01/05/1929
CLK Colwick on 28/01/1945
ANN Annesley on 30/05/1948
38A Colwick on 28/09/1952
38B Annesley on 22/01/1956
38A Colwick on 17/06/1956
   Withdrawn on 19/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 28/01/1956
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 23/06/1956
WDN   w/e 19/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1246)
03/03/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1967)
21/10/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1478)
01/12/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 933)
13/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3302)
29/06/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1940)
15/05/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1968)
01/09/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3410)
27/11/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3216)
20/08/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3296)
08/12/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22143)
03/05/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22266)
11/12/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28313)
12/10/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28936)
20/04/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28825)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/03/1929 18/04/1929 48 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6559
 
Gorton Works 23/12/1930 03/03/1931 71 days General
Boiler number 1967 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1933 21/10/1933 38 days General
Boiler number 1478 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1934 01/12/1934 36 days General
Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/07/1937 13/08/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1940 29/06/1940 18 days General
Boiler number 1940 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/04/1943 15/05/1943 35 days General
Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/06/1945 01/09/1945 73 days General
Boiler number 3410 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/10/1947 27/11/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/07/1949 20/08/1949 34 days General
Boiler number 3296 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63639
 
Gorton Works 22/11/1950 08/12/1950 17 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22143 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1950 29/12/1950 10 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 05/04/1952 03/05/1952 29 days General
Boiler number 22266 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/05/1952 07/05/1952 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 14/05/1952 24/05/1952 11 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 12/10/1954 11/12/1954 61 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28313 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 05/09/1957 12/10/1957 38 days General
Boiler number 28936 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 17/03/1960 20/04/1960 35 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28825 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 23/07/1962 29/08/1962 38 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 03/09/1962 07/09/1962 5 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1724
Built at Nasmyth Wilson, Works Number 1267
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
02/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1929. Dep: 18/04/1929.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6559
   
18/04/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/04/1929 To Stock To LNER stock    
01/05/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
23/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1930. Dep: 03/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1967 (Diagram 15)
   
14/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1933. Dep: 21/10/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1478 (Diagram 15)
   
27/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1934. Dep: 01/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15)
   
23/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1937. Dep: 13/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 15)
   
12/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1940. Dep: 29/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1940 (Diagram 15)
   
11/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1943. Dep: 15/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15)
   
28/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
21/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1945. Dep: 01/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3410 (Diagram 15)
   
18/01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3639    
23/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1947. Dep: 27/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15)
   
30/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
18/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1949. Dep: 20/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3296 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63639
   
22/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/11/1950. Dep: 08/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22143 (Diagram 15)
   
20/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1950. Dep: 29/12/1950.    
05/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1952. Dep: 03/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22266 (Diagram 15)
   
06/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/05/1952. Dep: 07/05/1952.    
14/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/05/1952. Dep: 24/05/1952.    
28/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
12/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1954. Dep: 11/12/1954.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28313 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
17/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
05/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1957. Dep: 12/10/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28936 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 17/03/1960. Dep: 20/04/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28825 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/07/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/07/1962. Dep: 29/08/1962.    
03/09/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/09/1962. Dep: 07/09/1962.    
19/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63639 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev