Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 350 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 350 Week
» 17686 Month
» 295482 Year
» 1179863 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1601 m/e 01/1918
LNWR 2900 m/e 12/1919
LNER (1924) 6373   31/05/1924
War Dept. 790   25/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 477Z
Works Number 5183
To Service During 01/1918
Taken into Stock 31/05/1924
Withdrawal Sat 25/10/1941 off Doncaster (DON)
Service Life 23 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 790 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 29/05/1924
LNG Langwith Junction 15/01/1926
DON Doncaster 11/01/1939
   Withdrawn 25/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1246)
12/01/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1456)
21/03/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 117)
03/06/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 861)
13/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1946)
14/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3203)
11/11/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1115)
25/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1174)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 05/04/1924 31/05/1924 57 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6373
 
Gorton Works 10/09/1927 22/10/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 27/10/1928 12/01/1929 78 days General
Boiler number 1456 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/03/1931 21/03/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 117 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1933 03/06/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 861 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1935 13/07/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1946 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/07/1937 14/08/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1939 11/11/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1941 25/10/1941 23 days General
Boiler number 1174 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 790
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1601
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5183
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2900    
08/1921 Allocation      
05/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 31/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6373
   
29/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
31/05/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
15/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
10/09/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1927. Dep: 22/10/1927.    
27/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1928. Dep: 12/01/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1456 (Diagram 15)
   
07/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1931. Dep: 21/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 117 (Diagram 15)
   
27/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1933. Dep: 03/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 861 (Diagram 15)
   
29/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1935. Dep: 13/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1946 (Diagram 15)
   
31/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1937. Dep: 14/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 15)
   
11/01/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
28/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1939. Dep: 11/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15)
   
03/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1941. Dep: 25/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1174 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 790
   
25/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 790 from Doncaster (DON)    

prev prev