Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 132 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4263 Week
» 14433 Month
» 292229 Year
» 1176610 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1603 m/e 01/1918
LNER (1924) 6543   02/03/1929
LNER (1946) 3644   24/11/1946
BR 63644 w/e 06/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/201/1918
O4/821/08/1954
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 477Z
Works Number 5185
To Service During 01/1918
Taken into Stock 23/03/1929
Withdrawal Sat 15/01/1966 off Colwick (16B)
Scrapping Cohens (Kettering)
Service Life 48 yrs , 15 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to George Cohen, Kettering 3/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
THJ Thornton Junction 23/03/1929
MEX Mexborough 03/10/1943
FRO Frodingham 16/09/1945
DON Doncaster 07/04/1946
MEX Mexborough 08/09/1946
LNG Langwith Junction 05/09/1947
40D Tuxford 28/03/1951
40E Langwith Junction 06/05/1951
40B Immingham 24/07/1955
40E Colwick 10/04/1960
   Withdrawn 15/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction 05/10/1947
ALLOC 40D Tuxford m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 12/05/1951
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 16/04/1960
ALLOC 16B Colwick 5w/e 08/01/1966
WDN   w/e 15/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 518)
04/11/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1443)
28/09/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3211)
12/02/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 804)
20/07/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1431)
10/09/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3324)
02/09/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1024)
22/02/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 945)
06/08/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3344)
12/04/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22260)
21/08/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28338)
09/03/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28384)
28/12/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28378)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/12/1928 02/03/1929 71 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6543
 
Cowlairs Works 23/03/1929 13/04/1929 22 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 21/07/1931 22/08/1931 33 days General  
Gorton Works 13/07/1933 04/11/1933 115 days General
Boiler number 1443 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/09/1935 28/09/1935 24 days General
Boiler number 3211 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/01/1938 12/02/1938 38 days General
Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1940 20/07/1940 26 days General
Boiler number 1431 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1942 10/09/1942 37 days General
Boiler number 3324 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1944 02/09/1944 23 days General
Boiler number 1024 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/12/1946 22/02/1947 80 days General
Boiler number 945 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1949 06/08/1949 30 days General
Boiler number 3344 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63644
 
Gorton Works 25/08/1949 27/08/1949 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 11/03/1952 12/04/1952 33 days General
Boiler number 22260 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1954 21/08/1954 83 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28338 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 28/01/1957 09/03/1957 41 days General
Boiler number 28384 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 08/11/1958 15/11/1958 8 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 23/11/1959 22/12/1959 30 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 16/11/1962 28/12/1962 43 days General
Boiler number 28378 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1603
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5185
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
22/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1928. Dep: 02/03/1929.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6543
   
23/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ)    
23/03/1929 To Stock To LNER stock    
23/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/03/1929. Dep: 13/04/1929.    
21/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1931. Dep: 22/08/1931.    
13/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1933. Dep: 04/11/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1443 (Diagram 15)
   
05/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1935. Dep: 28/09/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3211 (Diagram 15)
   
06/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1938. Dep: 12/02/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15)
   
25/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1940. Dep: 20/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1431 (Diagram 15)
   
05/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1942. Dep: 10/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3324 (Diagram 15)
   
03/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
11/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1944. Dep: 02/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1024 (Diagram 15)
   
16/09/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
08/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
24/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3644    
05/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1946. Dep: 22/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 945 (Diagram 15)
   
05/09/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
08/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1949. Dep: 06/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3344 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63644
   
25/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/08/1949. Dep: 27/08/1949.    
28/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
06/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
11/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1952. Dep: 12/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22260 (Diagram 15)
   
31/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1954. Dep: 21/08/1954.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28338 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
28/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1957. Dep: 09/03/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28384 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/11/1958. Dep: 15/11/1958.    
23/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/11/1959. Dep: 22/12/1959.    
10/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
16/11/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1962. Dep: 28/12/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28378 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 63644 from Colwick (16B)    

prev prev