|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/12/1928 | 02/03/1929 | 71 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/2 Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6543 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/03/1929 | 13/04/1929 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/07/1931 | 22/08/1931 | 33 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/07/1933 | 04/11/1933 | 115 days | General | Boiler number 1443 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/09/1935 | 28/09/1935 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 3211 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/01/1938 | 12/02/1938 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1940 | 20/07/1940 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 1431 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/08/1942 | 10/09/1942 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3324 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1944 | 02/09/1944 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 1024 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/12/1946 | 22/02/1947 | 80 days | General | Boiler number 945 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/07/1949 | 06/08/1949 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3344 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63644 |
||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1949 | 27/08/1949 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 11/03/1952 | 12/04/1952 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 22260 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/05/1954 | 21/08/1954 | 83 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28338 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/01/1957 | 09/03/1957 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28384 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/11/1958 | 15/11/1958 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1959 | 22/12/1959 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 16/11/1962 | 28/12/1962 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 28378 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/01/1966 | Colwick MPD | Consequent upon the transfer of Colwick depot to the London Midland Region on 3rd January, 1966, the following locomotives allocated to that depot have been transferred to L.M. Region Book Stock with effect from 2nd January: D2300/1/2, D3442/89/90, D3625/6/7/8, D4064/86, 61089/92/232/81/302/90, 63644/74/5/816/73, 90104/413/533/606/69/89/706. In addition, the L.M.R. locos. transferred to Colwick, on loan, have now been returned to L.M. Reg. stock, following the transfer of the depot to that Region, together with D3152/3/64/6 and D5195 which were also on loan. | SLS/196603 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1603 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5185 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
22/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1928. Dep: 02/03/1929. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/2 Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6543 |
||
23/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ) | ||
23/03/1929 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
23/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/03/1929. Dep: 13/04/1929. | ||
21/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1931. Dep: 22/08/1931. | ||
13/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1933. Dep: 04/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1443 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1935. Dep: 28/09/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3211 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1938. Dep: 12/02/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1940. Dep: 20/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1431 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1942. Dep: 10/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3324 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
11/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1944. Dep: 02/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1024 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/09/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
08/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
24/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3644 | ||
05/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1946. Dep: 22/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 945 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
08/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1949. Dep: 06/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3344 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63644 |
||
25/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/08/1949. Dep: 27/08/1949. | ||
28/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
06/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
11/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1952. Dep: 12/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22260 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1954. Dep: 21/08/1954. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28338 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
28/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1957. Dep: 09/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28384 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/11/1958. Dep: 15/11/1958. | ||
23/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/11/1959. Dep: 22/12/1959. | ||
10/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
16/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1962. Dep: 28/12/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28378 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/01/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63644 from Colwick (16B) |