Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 112 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1037 Week
» 18373 Month
» 296169 Year
» 1180550 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1604 m/e 02/1918
LNER (1924) 6366   02/02/1924
LNER (1946) 3645   24/11/1946
BR 63645 w/e 21/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/302/1918
O4/801/09/1956
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 477Z
Works Number 5186
To Service During 02/1918
Taken into Stock 02/02/1924
Withdrawal Tue 14/04/1964 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield)
Service Life 46 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to W E Smiths, Ecclesfield, 6/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 05/02/1924
CLK Colwick 21/02/1927
WFD Woodford Halse 05/04/1927
IMM Immingham 25/10/1929
KEA Keadby 14/04/1932
FRO Frodingham 12/06/1932
39B Sheffield Darnall 01/07/1951
41F Mexborough 16/06/1963
41J Langwith Junction 22/12/1963
   Withdrawn 14/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 9w/e 08/02/1964
WDN   14/04/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1180)
04/07/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1461)
05/11/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 821)
18/12/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 546)
22/02/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 548)
23/05/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1208)
23/05/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
27/08/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 871)
07/12/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3326)
07/08/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3201)
11/05/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 867)
19/08/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3338)
06/01/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22151)
23/05/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22895)
01/09/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28321)
13/11/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28338)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 26/01/1924 02/02/1924 8 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6366
 
Gorton Works 06/05/1924 04/07/1924 60 days General
Boiler number 1461 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1927 05/11/1927 36 days General
Boiler number 821 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1929 20/08/1929 53 days General  
Gorton Works 07/11/1931 18/12/1931 42 days General
Boiler number 546 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/02/1934 22/02/1934 12 days General
Altered spring gear for working to Whitemoor
Boiler number 548 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/03/1936 23/05/1936 55 days General
Boiler number 1208 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 14/07/1938 27/08/1938 45 days General
Boiler number 871 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/11/1940 07/12/1940 28 days General
Boiler number 3326 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/07/1943 07/08/1943 20 days General
Boiler number 3201 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/12/1943 01/01/1944 24 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 20/02/1946 11/05/1946 81 days General
Boiler number 867 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/06/1948 19/08/1948 53 days General
Boiler number 3338 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63645
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1950 06/01/1951 32 days General
Boiler number 22151 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/01/1951 13/01/1951 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 18/01/1951 19/01/1951 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 11/04/1953 23/05/1953 43 days General
Boiler number 22895 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1956 01/09/1956 90 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28321 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 19/10/1959 13/11/1959 26 days General
Boiler number 28338 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1962 10/08/1962 46 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1604
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5186
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
26/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/01/1924. Dep: 02/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6366
   
02/02/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
05/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
06/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1924. Dep: 04/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1461 (Diagram 15)
   
21/02/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
05/04/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
01/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1927. Dep: 05/11/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 821 (Diagram 15)
   
29/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1929. Dep: 20/08/1929.    
25/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
07/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1931. Dep: 18/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 546 (Diagram 15)
   
14/04/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Keadby (KEA)    
12/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
11/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1934. Dep: 22/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Altered spring gear for working to Whitemoor
Boiler number 548 (Diagram 15)
   
30/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1936. Dep: 23/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1208 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
14/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1938. Dep: 27/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 871 (Diagram 15)
   
10/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1940. Dep: 07/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3326 (Diagram 15)
   
19/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1943. Dep: 07/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3201 (Diagram 15)
   
09/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/12/1943. Dep: 01/01/1944.    
20/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1946. Dep: 11/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 867 (Diagram 15)
   
24/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3645    
28/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1948. Dep: 19/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3338 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63645
   
06/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1950. Dep: 06/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22151 (Diagram 15)
   
10/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/01/1951. Dep: 13/01/1951.    
18/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/01/1951. Dep: 19/01/1951.    
01/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
11/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1953. Dep: 23/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22895 (Diagram 15)
   
04/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1956. Dep: 01/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28321 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/10/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1959. Dep: 13/11/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28338 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/06/1962. Dep: 10/08/1962.    
16/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
22/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
14/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63645 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev