Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 942 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 5073 Week
» 15243 Month
» 293039 Year
» 1177420 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1606 m/e 02/1918
LNER (1924) 6544   13/10/1928
LNER (1946) 3647   12/12/1946
BR 63647   02/09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/202/1918
O4/801/03/1958
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 477Z
Works Number 5188
To Service During 02/1918
Taken into Stock 19/12/1928
Withdrawal Wed 06/05/1964 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
Service Life 46 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Cox & Danks, Wadsley Bridge, 6/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DFU Dunfermline Upper 19/12/1928
LNG Langwith Junction 27/07/1943
DON Doncaster 27/10/1946
40B Immingham 25/06/1950
38A Colwick 20/09/1953
36C Frodingham 21/06/1959
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 31/01/1960
36A Doncaster 03/03/1963
   Withdrawn 06/05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 5w/e 06/04/1963
WDN   06/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
0000 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3262)
02/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1377)
07/11/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1470)
03/02/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1042)
19/09/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1188)
21/04/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 927)
26/08/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3236)
02/09/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22100)
28/02/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22115)
02/04/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22138)
01/03/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28365)
27/04/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28973)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1928 13/10/1928   General
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6544
 
Cowlairs Works 18/12/1928 18/12/1928 1 day Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 29/04/1930 13/06/1930 46 days General  
Gorton Works 29/09/1932 07/11/1932 40 days General
Boiler number C1470 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1934 03/02/1934 24 days General
Boiler number 1042 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/08/1936 19/09/1936 32 days General
Boiler number 1188 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1937 29/12/1937 6 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 04/05/1939 17/06/1939 45 days General  
Gorton Works 11/02/1943 27/03/1943 45 days General  
Cowlairs Works 15/05/1943 21/05/1943 7 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 16/03/1945 21/04/1945 37 days General
Boiler number 927 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1947 26/08/1947 72 days General
Boiler number 3236 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/08/1950 02/09/1950 27 days General
Boiler number 22100 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63647
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1953 28/02/1953 24 days General
Boiler number 22115 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1955 02/04/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 22138 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/01/1958 01/03/1958 51 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28365 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 12/10/1959 19/11/1959 39 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 18/03/1961 27/04/1961 41 days General
Boiler number 28973 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Modification Diagram 15 number 3262 boiler fitted    
02/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1606
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5188
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1928. Dep: 13/10/1928.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6544
   
18/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/12/1928. Dep: 18/12/1928.    
19/12/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
19/12/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
29/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1930. Dep: 13/06/1930.    
29/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1932. Dep: 07/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1470 (Diagram 15)
   
11/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1934. Dep: 03/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1042 (Diagram 15)
   
19/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1936. Dep: 19/09/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1188 (Diagram 15)
   
24/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/12/1937. Dep: 29/12/1937.    
04/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1939. Dep: 17/06/1939.    
11/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1943. Dep: 27/03/1943.    
15/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/05/1943. Dep: 21/05/1943.    
27/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
16/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 927 (Diagram 15)
   
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
12/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3647    
16/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1947. Dep: 26/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3236 (Diagram 15)
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
07/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1950. Dep: 02/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22100 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63647
   
05/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1953. Dep: 28/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22115 (Diagram 15)
   
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
05/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1955. Dep: 02/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22138 (Diagram 15)
   
10/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1958. Dep: 01/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28365 (Diagram 100A)
   
21/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
12/10/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/10/1959. Dep: 19/11/1959.    
31/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
18/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1961. Dep: 27/04/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28973 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
06/05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63647 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev