|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 22/02/1924 | 30/08/1924 | 191 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6372 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/10/1926 | 31/01/1927 | 123 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/01/1929 | 23/02/1929 | 48 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/06/1931 | 07/08/1931 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/01/1934 | 03/02/1934 | 25 days | General | Boiler number C1469 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/02/1936 | 07/03/1936 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/09/1938 | 15/10/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3349 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/01/1941 | 25/01/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3432 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/12/1942 | 02/01/1943 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1286 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1945 | 11/08/1945 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3412 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/01/1948 | 21/02/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1291 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3648 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1951 | 17/02/1951 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22164 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63648 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1951 | 23/02/1951 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1951 | 20/10/1951 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 05/09/1953 | 26/09/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22274 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1953 | 05/10/1953 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1955 | 10/12/1955 | 15 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22121 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1957 | 06/04/1957 | 22 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1957 | 13/04/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1962 | 23/01/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1607 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5189 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2883 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
22/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1924. Dep: 30/08/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6372 |
||
30/08/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
30/08/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
01/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1926. Dep: 31/01/1927. | ||
07/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1929. Dep: 23/02/1929. | ||
19/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1931. Dep: 07/08/1931. | ||
10/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1934. Dep: 03/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1469 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1936. Dep: 07/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1938. Dep: 15/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3349 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1941. Dep: 25/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3432 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1942. Dep: 02/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1286 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU) | ||
30/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
28/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1945. Dep: 11/08/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3412 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3648 | ||
31/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1948. Dep: 21/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1291 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3648 |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
03/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1951. Dep: 17/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22164 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63648 |
||
18/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/02/1951. Dep: 23/02/1951. | ||
11/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/10/1951. Dep: 20/10/1951. | ||
29/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
05/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1953. Dep: 26/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22274 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/09/1953. Dep: 05/10/1953. | ||
26/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 26/11/1955. Dep: 10/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22121 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/03/1957. Dep: 06/04/1957. | ||
12/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/04/1957. Dep: 13/04/1957. | ||
02/12/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
31/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
23/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 23/01/1962. Dep: 23/01/1962. | ||
26/01/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63648 from Mexborough (41F) |