Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 43 Today
» 1000 Yesterday
» 1968 Week
» 19304 Month
» 297100 Year
» 1181481 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1607 m/e 02/1918
LNWR 2883 m/e 09/1919
LNER (1924) 6372   30/08/1924
LNER (1946) 3648   08/10/1946
BR (Tmp) E3648   21/02/1948
BR 63648 w/e 17/02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 477Z
Works Number 5189
To Service During 02/1918
Taken into Stock 30/08/1924
Withdrawal Fri 26/01/1962 off Mexborough (41F)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 43 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 30/08/1924
DFU Dunfermline Upper 15/07/1943
MEX Mexborough 30/09/1943
40E Langwith Junction 02/07/1950
38D Staveley (G.C.) 02/12/1957
41F Mexborough 31/01/1960
   Withdrawn 26/01/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   26/01/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1476)
03/02/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1469)
07/03/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1950)
15/10/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3349)
25/01/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3432)
02/01/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1286)
11/08/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3412)
21/02/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1291)
17/02/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22164)
26/09/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22274)
10/12/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22121)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 22/02/1924 30/08/1924 191 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6372
 
Cowlairs Works 01/10/1926 31/01/1927 123 days General  
Cowlairs Works 07/01/1929 23/02/1929 48 days General  
Cowlairs Works 19/06/1931 07/08/1931 50 days General  
Gorton Works 10/01/1934 03/02/1934 25 days General
Boiler number C1469 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/02/1936 07/03/1936 8 days General
Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1938 15/10/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 3349 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1941 25/01/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 3432 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1942 02/01/1943 22 days General
Boiler number 1286 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/07/1945 11/08/1945 15 days General
Boiler number 3412 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/01/1948 21/02/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 1291 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3648
 
Gorton Works 03/02/1951 17/02/1951 15 days General
Boiler number 22164 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63648
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1951 23/02/1951 6 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 11/10/1951 20/10/1951 10 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 05/09/1953 26/09/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22274 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1953 05/10/1953 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 26/11/1955 10/12/1955 15 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22121 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1957 06/04/1957 22 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 12/04/1957 13/04/1957 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 23/01/1962 23/01/1962 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1607
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5189
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2883    
08/1921 Allocation      
22/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1924. Dep: 30/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6372
   
30/08/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE)    
30/08/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
01/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1926. Dep: 31/01/1927.    
07/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1929. Dep: 23/02/1929.    
19/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1931. Dep: 07/08/1931.    
10/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1934. Dep: 03/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1469 (Diagram 15)
   
29/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1936. Dep: 07/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15)
   
24/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1938. Dep: 15/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3349 (Diagram 15)
   
11/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1941. Dep: 25/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3432 (Diagram 15)
   
12/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1942. Dep: 02/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1286 (Diagram 15)
   
15/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
30/09/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
28/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1945. Dep: 11/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3412 (Diagram 15)
   
08/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3648    
31/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1948. Dep: 21/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1291 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E3648
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
03/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1951. Dep: 17/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22164 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63648
   
18/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/02/1951. Dep: 23/02/1951.    
11/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/10/1951. Dep: 20/10/1951.    
05/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1953. Dep: 26/09/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22274 (Diagram 15)
   
29/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/09/1953. Dep: 05/10/1953.    
26/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 26/11/1955. Dep: 10/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22121 (Diagram 15)
   
16/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/03/1957. Dep: 06/04/1957.    
12/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/04/1957. Dep: 13/04/1957.    
02/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
31/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
23/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 23/01/1962. Dep: 23/01/1962.    
26/01/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63648 from Mexborough (41F)    

prev prev