Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 324 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 324 Week
» 7508 Month
» 315489 Year
» 1199870 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1608 m/e 03/1918
LNER (1924) 6365   15/03/1924
LNER (1946) 3649   24/11/1946
BR 63649 w/e 14/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/303/1918
O4/830/11/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 477Z
Works Number 5190
To Service During 03/1918
Taken into Stock 15/03/1924
Withdrawal Fri 24/03/1961 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 43 yrs , 23 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 15/03/1924
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) 22/11/1940
WFD Woodford Halse 30/01/1943
DFU Dunfermline Upper 10/02/1943
FRO Frodingham 29/09/1943
40B Immingham 20/05/1951
38A Colwick 20/09/1953
39A Gorton 21/11/1954
   Withdrawn 24/03/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40B Immingham w/e 26/05/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 04/12/1954
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 25/03/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1328)
27/12/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1154)
04/06/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 805)
24/01/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1938)
11/06/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 549)
07/07/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 813)
11/07/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 807)
14/01/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1212)
13/07/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3327)
17/10/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1431)
23/06/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 811)
02/08/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3317)
14/01/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 860)
26/07/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22277)
22/05/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22248)
30/11/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28939)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 01/03/1924 15/03/1924 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6365
 
Gorton Works 16/08/1924 27/12/1924 134 days General
Boiler number 1154 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1927 04/06/1927 57 days General
Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1929 18/05/1929 22 days General  
Gorton Works 03/01/1931 24/01/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1938 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1932 11/06/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 549 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1934 07/07/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 813 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/06/1936 11/07/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1938 14/01/1939 29 days General
Boiler number 1212 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1940 13/07/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 3327 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1942 17/10/1942 15 days General
Boiler number 1431 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1945 23/06/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/06/1947 02/08/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 3317 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1949 14/01/1950 22 days General
Boiler number 860 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63649
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1950 24/01/1950 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 21/06/1952 26/07/1952 36 days General
Boiler number 22277 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/05/1954 22/05/1954 8 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22248 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/04/1955 04/06/1955 36 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 26/10/1957 30/11/1957 36 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28939 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 18/03/1961 18/03/1961 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1608
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5190
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
01/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/03/1924. Dep: 15/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6365
   
15/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
15/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
16/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1924. Dep: 27/12/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1154 (Diagram 15)
   
09/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1927. Dep: 04/06/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15)
   
27/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1929. Dep: 18/05/1929.    
03/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1931. Dep: 24/01/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1938 (Diagram 15)
   
04/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1932. Dep: 11/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 549 (Diagram 15)
   
23/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1934. Dep: 07/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 813 (Diagram 15)
   
27/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1936. Dep: 11/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15)
   
17/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1938. Dep: 14/01/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1212 (Diagram 15)
   
06/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1940. Dep: 13/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3327 (Diagram 15)
   
22/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
03/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1942. Dep: 17/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1431 (Diagram 15)
   
30/01/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
10/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
29/09/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
02/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1945. Dep: 23/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15)
   
24/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3649    
28/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1947. Dep: 02/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3317 (Diagram 15)
   
24/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1949. Dep: 14/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 860 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63649
   
18/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/01/1950. Dep: 24/01/1950.    
20/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
21/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1952. Dep: 26/07/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22277 (Diagram 15)
   
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
15/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 15/05/1954. Dep: 22/05/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22248 (Diagram 15)
   
21/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
30/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/04/1955. Dep: 04/06/1955.    
26/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1957. Dep: 30/11/1957.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28939 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 18/03/1961. Dep: 18/03/1961.    
24/03/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 63649 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev