Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 926 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1851 Week
» 19187 Month
» 296983 Year
» 1181364 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1609 m/e 03/1918
LNER (1924) 6545   04/05/1929
LNER (1946) 3650   02/11/1946
BR 63650 w/e 03/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/303/1918
O126/05/1945
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 477Z
Works Number 5191
To Service During 03/1918
Taken into Stock 03/05/1929
Withdrawal Sun 27/06/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping R A Kings (Norwich)
Service Life 47 yrs, 3 mths , 29 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to R A King, Norwich, 8/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick 03/05/1929
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
GOR Gorton 03/06/1945
CLK Colwick 18/08/1946
GOR Gorton 20/10/1946
38B Annesley 26/11/1950
31B March 17/02/1957
41H Staveley (G.C.) 07/02/1960
41J Langwith Junction 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn 27/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 27/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1338)
22/08/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1227)
02/12/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1046)
02/05/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
02/05/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1318)
09/07/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1881)
04/01/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1002)
20/02/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3244)
26/05/1945 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5035)
28/06/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5031)
03/09/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5011)
03/09/1949 Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
23/02/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28372)
17/10/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28325)
29/10/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28809)
01/02/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28824)
11/03/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28299)
19/03/1963 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28983)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 26/01/1929 04/05/1929 99 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6545
 
Gorton Works 01/08/1931 22/08/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1227 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/11/1933 02/12/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1046 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/04/1936 02/05/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1318 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1938 09/07/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 1881 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1940 04/01/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 1002 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/05/1942 06/06/1942 19 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 03/02/1943 20/02/1943 18 days General
Boiler number 3244 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/03/1945 26/05/1945 85 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5035 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 07/06/1947 28/06/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 5031 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 13/08/1949 03/09/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 5011 (Diagram 100A)
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
Renumbered to BR 63650
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1952 23/02/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 28372 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 26/09/1953 17/10/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 28325 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 19/06/1954 03/07/1954 15 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 01/10/1955 29/10/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 28809 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1957 01/02/1958 36 days General
Boiler number 28824 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 13/12/1958 13/12/1958 1 day Unclassified  
Gorton Works 04/02/1961 11/03/1961 36 days General
Boiler number 28299 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 20/02/1963 19/03/1963 28 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 28983 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1609
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5191
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
26/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1929. Dep: 04/05/1929.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6545
   
03/05/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
03/05/1929 To Stock To ROD stock    
01/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1931. Dep: 22/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1227 (Diagram 15)
   
18/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1933. Dep: 02/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1046 (Diagram 15)
   
18/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1936. Dep: 02/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1318 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
25/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1938. Dep: 09/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1881 (Diagram 15)
   
21/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1940. Dep: 04/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1002 (Diagram 15)
   
19/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/05/1942. Dep: 06/06/1942.    
03/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1943. Dep: 20/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3244 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
03/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1945. Dep: 26/05/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5035 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
02/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3650    
07/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1947. Dep: 28/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5031 (Diagram 100A)
   
13/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1949. Dep: 03/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5011 (Diagram 100A)
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
Renumbered to BR 63650
   
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
02/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1952. Dep: 23/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28372 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1953. Dep: 17/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28325 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/06/1954. Dep: 03/07/1954.    
01/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1955. Dep: 29/10/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28809 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
28/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1957. Dep: 01/02/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28824 (Diagram 100A)
   
13/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/12/1958. Dep: 13/12/1958.    
07/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
04/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1961. Dep: 11/03/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28299 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/02/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/02/1963. Dep: 19/03/1963.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28983 (Diagram 100A)
   
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
27/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63650 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev