Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 165 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 165 Week
» 39211 Month
» 413224 Year
» 1634789 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1610 m/e 03/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6539   01/08/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3651   15/09/1946
British Railways 63651 w/e 29/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/303/1918
O4/807/12/1946
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 477Z
Works Number 5192
To Service During 03/1918
Taken into Stock 01/08/1925
Withdrawal Sun 11/07/1965 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
Service Life 47 yrs, 4 mths , 12 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Cox & Danks, Wadsley Bridge, 8/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1918
GOR Gorton on 01/08/1925
CLK Colwick on 18/08/1925
LNG Langwith Junction on 16/09/1927
IMM Immingham on 18/12/1949
40E Colwick on 23/09/1962
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 30/12/1962
36C Frodingham on 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn on 11/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 12/01/1963
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1296)
24/07/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1124)
04/06/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1837)
04/08/1934 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
04/08/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1075)
01/07/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3248)
02/05/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 514)
15/06/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3310)
09/01/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3339)
07/12/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5087)
29/01/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5021)
02/06/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28321)
28/03/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28268)
21/10/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28885)
02/08/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28881)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 01/06/1925 01/08/1925 62 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6539
 
Gorton Works 16/04/1928 03/07/1928 79 days General  
Gorton Works 12/06/1930 24/07/1930 43 days General
Boiler number 1124 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/04/1932 04/06/1932 41 days General
Boiler number 1837 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/07/1934 04/08/1934 31 days General
Boiler number 1075 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1936 01/07/1936 23 days General
Boiler number 3248 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1938 02/05/1938 42 days General
Chimney altered
Boiler number 514 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1940 15/06/1940 20 days General
Boiler number 3310 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 01/11/1942 09/01/1943 70 days General
Boiler number 3339 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/03/1945 19/05/1945 53 days General  
Gorton Works 14/10/1946 07/12/1946 55 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5087 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 16/12/1948 29/01/1949 45 days General
Boiler number 5021 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63651
 
Gorton Works 03/04/1951 02/06/1951 61 days General
Boiler number 28321 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1953 28/03/1953 27 days General
Boiler number 28268 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/09/1955 21/10/1955 50 days General
Boiler number 28885 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1958 02/08/1958 59 days General
Boiler number 28881 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 05/12/1958 10/01/1959 37 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 21/03/1960 19/04/1960 30 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 29/05/1961 07/07/1961 40 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1610
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5192
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
01/08/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
01/08/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
18/08/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
16/09/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
15/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3651    
18/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
23/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
30/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
11/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63651 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev