|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 01/06/1925 | 01/08/1925 | 62 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6539 |
||
Gorton Works | 16/04/1928 | 03/07/1928 | 79 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1930 | 24/07/1930 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1124 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1932 | 04/06/1932 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 1837 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/07/1934 | 04/08/1934 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 1075 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/06/1936 | 01/07/1936 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 3248 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1938 | 02/05/1938 | 42 days | General | Chimney altered Boiler number 514 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1940 | 15/06/1940 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 3310 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 01/11/1942 | 09/01/1943 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 3339 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1945 | 19/05/1945 | 53 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/10/1946 | 07/12/1946 | 55 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5087 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/12/1948 | 29/01/1949 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 5021 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63651 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/04/1951 | 02/06/1951 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 28321 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1953 | 28/03/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28268 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/09/1955 | 21/10/1955 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 28885 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/06/1958 | 02/08/1958 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 28881 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/12/1958 | 10/01/1959 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 21/03/1960 | 19/04/1960 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 29/05/1961 | 07/07/1961 | 40 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1610 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5192 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
01/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1925. Dep: 01/08/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6539 |
||
01/08/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
01/08/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
18/08/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
16/09/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
16/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1928. Dep: 03/07/1928. | ||
12/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1930. Dep: 24/07/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1124 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1932. Dep: 04/06/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1837 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1934. Dep: 04/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1075 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
09/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1936. Dep: 01/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3248 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1938. Dep: 02/05/1938. Work undertaken: Chimney altered Boiler number 514 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1940. Dep: 15/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3310 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1942. Dep: 09/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3339 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1945. Dep: 19/05/1945. | ||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3651 | ||
14/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1946. Dep: 07/12/1946. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5087 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1948. Dep: 29/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5021 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63651 |
||
18/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
24/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
03/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1951. Dep: 02/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28321 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1953. Dep: 28/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28268 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1955. Dep: 21/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28885 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1958. Dep: 02/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28881 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/12/1958. Dep: 10/01/1959. | ||
21/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/03/1960. Dep: 19/04/1960. | ||
29/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/05/1961. Dep: 07/07/1961. | ||
23/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
30/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
11/07/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63651 from Frodingham (36C) |