Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 763 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3449 Week
» 4339 Month
» 312320 Year
» 1196701 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1611 m/e 03/1918
LNWR 2901 m/e 12/1919
LNER (1924) 6371   28/06/1924
LNER (1946) 3652   22/11/1946
BR 63652 w/e 03/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/303/1918
O4/406/07/1929
O115/12/1945
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 477Z
Works Number 5193
To Service During 03/1918
Taken into Stock 28/06/1924
Withdrawal Mon 11/11/1963 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 45 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 4/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 24/06/1924
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 05/07/1924
DON Doncaster 17/01/1925
LNG Langwith Junction 13/06/1943
GOR Gorton 06/01/1946
CLK Colwick 18/08/1946
GOR Gorton 20/10/1946
38B Annesley 26/11/1950
31B March 10/02/1957
41H Staveley (G.C.) 14/02/1960
40E Colwick 07/10/1962
41H Staveley (G.C.) 09/06/1963
   Withdrawn 11/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 40E Colwick w/e 25/10/1962
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 29/06/1963
WDN   11/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1243)
16/04/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1317)
06/07/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 981)
10/10/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 4407)
15/12/1945 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5048)
02/1946 Drop Grate fitted
03/04/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5046)
16/09/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28257)
14/06/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28299)
05/06/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28380)
04/08/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28371)
18/10/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28377)
21/04/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28895)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 05/04/1924 28/06/1924 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6371
 
Gorton Works 29/01/1927 16/04/1927 78 days General
Boiler number 1317 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1929 06/07/1929 50 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/4
Boiler number 981 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/06/1931 11/07/1931 29 days General  
Gorton Works 14/10/1933 18/11/1933 36 days General  
Gorton Works 28/04/1934 26/05/1934 29 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 10/08/1935 24/08/1935 15 days General  
Gorton Works 16/10/1937 06/11/1937 22 days General  
Gorton Works 13/01/1940 03/02/1940 22 days General  
Stratford Works 19/08/1942 10/10/1942 53 days General
Boiler number 4407 (Diagram 15)
 
Doncaster Works 12/04/1943 05/06/1943 55 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 29/07/1944 29/07/1944 1 day Unclassified  
Gorton Works 15/09/1945 15/12/1945 92 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5048 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 1946 02/1946   Light Repair
Drop Grate fitted
 
Gorton Works 13/03/1948 03/04/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 5046 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63652
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1950 16/09/1950 22 days General
Boiler number 28257 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1952 14/06/1952 15 days General
Boiler number 28299 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1953 04/07/1953 15 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 15/05/1954 05/06/1954 22 days General
Boiler number 28380 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 28/05/1955 02/07/1955 36 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 16/06/1956 04/08/1956 50 days General
Boiler number 28371 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 13/09/1958 18/10/1958 36 days General
Boiler number 28377 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 05/02/1962 21/04/1962 76 days General
Boiler number 28895 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1611
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5193
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2901    
08/1921 Allocation      
05/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 28/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6371
   
24/06/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
28/06/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
05/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
17/01/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
29/01/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1927. Dep: 16/04/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1317 (Diagram 15)
   
18/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1929. Dep: 06/07/1929.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/4
Boiler number 981 (Diagram 15)
   
13/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1931. Dep: 11/07/1931.    
14/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1933. Dep: 18/11/1933.    
28/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/04/1934. Dep: 26/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
10/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1935. Dep: 24/08/1935.    
16/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1937. Dep: 06/11/1937.    
13/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1940. Dep: 03/02/1940.    
19/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4407 (Diagram 15)
   
12/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/04/1943. Dep: 05/06/1943.    
13/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
29/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/07/1944. Dep: 29/07/1944.    
15/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1945. Dep: 15/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5048 (Diagram 100A)
   
1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: ?/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Drop Grate fitted
   
06/01/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3652    
13/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1948. Dep: 03/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5046 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63652
   
26/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1950. Dep: 16/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28257 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
31/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1952. Dep: 14/06/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28299 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/06/1953. Dep: 04/07/1953.    
15/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1954. Dep: 05/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28380 (Diagram 100A)
   
28/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/05/1955. Dep: 02/07/1955.    
16/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1956. Dep: 04/08/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28371 (Diagram 100A)
   
10/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
13/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1958. Dep: 18/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28377 (Diagram 100A)
   
14/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
26/02/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside stripping shop.   Link
05/02/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1962. Dep: 21/04/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28895 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
09/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
11/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63652 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev