|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/04/1924 | 28/06/1924 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6371 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1927 | 16/04/1927 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1317 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1929 | 06/07/1929 | 50 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/4 Boiler number 981 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1931 | 11/07/1931 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/10/1933 | 18/11/1933 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1934 | 26/05/1934 | 29 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1935 | 24/08/1935 | 15 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1937 | 06/11/1937 | 22 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1940 | 03/02/1940 | 22 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 19/08/1942 | 10/10/1942 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 4407 (Diagram 15) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1943 | 05/06/1943 | 55 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1944 | 29/07/1944 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 15/09/1945 | 15/12/1945 | 92 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5048 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 1946 | 02/1946 | Light Repair | Drop Grate fitted |
|||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1948 | 03/04/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 5046 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63652 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/08/1950 | 16/09/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28257 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/05/1952 | 14/06/1952 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 28299 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/06/1953 | 04/07/1953 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 15/05/1954 | 05/06/1954 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28380 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/05/1955 | 02/07/1955 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1956 | 04/08/1956 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 28371 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/09/1958 | 18/10/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28377 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1962 | 21/04/1962 | 76 days | General | Boiler number 28895 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Outside Stripping Shop) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1611 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5193 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/1919 | Allocation | |||
12/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2901 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
05/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 28/06/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6371 |
||
24/06/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
28/06/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
05/07/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
17/01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
29/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1927. Dep: 16/04/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1317 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1929. Dep: 06/07/1929. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/4 Boiler number 981 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1931. Dep: 11/07/1931. | ||
14/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1933. Dep: 18/11/1933. | ||
28/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/04/1934. Dep: 26/05/1934. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
10/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1935. Dep: 24/08/1935. | ||
16/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1937. Dep: 06/11/1937. | ||
13/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1940. Dep: 03/02/1940. | ||
19/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4407 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/04/1943. Dep: 05/06/1943. | ||
13/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
29/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/07/1944. Dep: 29/07/1944. | ||
15/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1945. Dep: 15/12/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5048 (Diagram 100A) |
||
1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: ?/02/1946. Work undertaken: Drop Grate fitted |
||
06/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
22/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3652 | ||
13/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1948. Dep: 03/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5046 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63652 |
||
26/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1950. Dep: 16/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28257 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
31/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1952. Dep: 14/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28299 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/06/1953. Dep: 04/07/1953. | ||
15/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1954. Dep: 05/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28380 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/05/1955. Dep: 02/07/1955. | ||
16/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1956. Dep: 04/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28371 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
13/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1958. Dep: 18/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28377 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
05/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1962. Dep: 21/04/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28895 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/10/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
09/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
11/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63652 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |