|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/03/1924 | 31/05/1924 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6369 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/02/1927 | 19/03/1927 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1929 | 20/07/1929 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 1962 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/06/1931 | 11/07/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/10/1933 | 21/10/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 924 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1935 | 14/09/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1004 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1937 | 25/09/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1120 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/10/1939 | 04/11/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1068 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/09/1941 | 20/09/1941 | 11 days | General | Boiler number 3440 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 743 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1614 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5200 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
22/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1924. Dep: 31/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6369 |
||
31/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
31/05/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
19/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1927. Dep: 19/03/1927. | ||
18/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1929. Dep: 20/07/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1962 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1931. Dep: 11/07/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1933. Dep: 21/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 924 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1935. Dep: 14/09/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1004 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
04/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1937. Dep: 25/09/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1120 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1939. Dep: 04/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1068 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3440 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 743 |
||
19/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 743 from March (MAR) |