Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 98 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5735 Week
» 18839 Month
» 18839 Year
» 1240404 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1614 m/e 05/1918
LNER (1924) 6369   31/05/1924
War Dept. 743   19/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 479C
Works Number 5200
To Service During 05/1918
Taken into Stock 31/05/1924
Withdrawal Fri 19/09/1941 off March (MAR)
Service Life 23 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 743 and sent to the Middle East via Swansea, 15/10/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 31/05/1924
MAR March 16/10/1935
   Withdrawn 19/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1961)
20/07/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1962)
11/07/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1950)
21/10/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 924)
14/09/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1004)
25/09/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1120)
04/11/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1068)
20/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3440)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/03/1924 31/05/1924 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6369
 
Gorton Works 19/02/1927 19/03/1927 29 days General  
Gorton Works 18/05/1929 20/07/1929 64 days General
Boiler number 1962 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1931 11/07/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/10/1933 21/10/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 924 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1935 14/09/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 1004 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1937 25/09/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 1120 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1939 04/11/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1068 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/09/1941 20/09/1941 11 days General
Boiler number 3440 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 743
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1614
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5200
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
22/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1924. Dep: 31/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6369
   
31/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
31/05/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
19/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1927. Dep: 19/03/1927.    
18/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1929. Dep: 20/07/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1962 (Diagram 15)
   
20/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1931. Dep: 11/07/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1950 (Diagram 15)
   
14/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1933. Dep: 21/10/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 924 (Diagram 15)
   
24/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1935. Dep: 14/09/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1004 (Diagram 15)
   
16/10/1935 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
04/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1937. Dep: 25/09/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1120 (Diagram 15)
   
21/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1939. Dep: 04/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1068 (Diagram 15)
   
10/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3440 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 743
   
19/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 743 from March (MAR)    

prev prev