Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 9 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2870 Week
» 21652 Month
» 269945 Year
» 1154326 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1616 m/e 06/1918
LNER (1924) 6364   09/02/1924
LNER (1946) 3655   16/12/1946
BR 63655 w/e 02/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1918
O4/726/04/1941
O4/819/01/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 479C
Works Number 5202
To Service During 06/1918
Taken into Stock 09/02/1924
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 44 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 19/8/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 15/02/1924
IMM Immingham 22/02/1924
MAR March 17/04/1930
CAM Cambridge 08/05/1935
MAR March 02/08/1935
BRN Barnsley 22/10/1941
STV Staveley (G.C.) 29/08/1943
WFD Woodford Halse 10/08/1944
FRO Frodingham 07/04/1946
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 30/01/1955
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 26/02/1955
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1887)
28/01/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1954)
23/04/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1889)
16/06/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1134)
25/07/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1034)
25/03/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 932)
26/04/1941 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3679)
20/11/1943 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3677)
23/03/1946 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3678)
02/10/1948 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3656)
24/11/1951 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22325)
03/04/1954 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22316)
19/01/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28926)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/12/1923 09/02/1924 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6364
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1925 12/12/1925 71 days General  
Gorton Works 17/12/1927 28/01/1928 43 days General
Boiler number 1954 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1930 29/03/1930 29 days General  
Gorton Works 09/04/1932 23/04/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1889 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/05/1934 16/06/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/07/1936 25/07/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1034 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1939 25/03/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 932 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/01/1940 10/02/1940 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 29/03/1941 26/04/1941 29 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3679 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 03/04/1942 25/04/1942 23 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 06/11/1943 20/11/1943 15 days General
Boiler number 3677 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1946 23/03/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3678 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1948 02/10/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 3656 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63655
 
Gorton Works 03/11/1951 24/11/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 22325 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 27/11/1951 08/12/1951 12 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 13/03/1954 03/04/1954 22 days General  
Gorton Works 03/04/1954 05/04/1954 3 days Unclassified
Boiler number 22316 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1956 19/01/1957 50 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28926 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 20/01/1957 24/01/1957 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 04/08/1958 06/09/1958 34 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 26/04/1960 04/06/1960 40 days Light Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1616
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5202
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
22/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1923. Dep: 09/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6364
   
09/02/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
15/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
03/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1925. Dep: 12/12/1925.    
17/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1927. Dep: 28/01/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1954 (Diagram 15)
   
01/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1930. Dep: 29/03/1930.    
17/04/1930 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
09/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1932. Dep: 23/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1889 (Diagram 15)
   
26/05/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1934. Dep: 16/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15)
   
08/05/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
02/08/1935 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
11/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1936. Dep: 25/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1034 (Diagram 15)
   
04/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1939. Dep: 25/03/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 932 (Diagram 15)
   
27/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/01/1940. Dep: 10/02/1940.    
29/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1941. Dep: 26/04/1941.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3679 (Diagram 15D)
   
22/10/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
03/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/04/1942. Dep: 25/04/1942.    
29/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
06/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1943. Dep: 20/11/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3677 (Diagram 15D)
   
10/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
02/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1946. Dep: 23/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3678 (Diagram 15D)
   
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
16/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3655    
04/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1948. Dep: 02/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3656 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63655
   
03/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1951. Dep: 24/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22325 (Diagram 15D)
   
27/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/11/1951. Dep: 08/12/1951.    
13/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1954. Dep: 03/04/1954.    
03/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/04/1954. Dep: 05/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22316 (Diagram 15D)
   
30/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
01/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1956. Dep: 19/01/1957.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28926 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/01/1957. Dep: 24/01/1957.    
04/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/08/1958. Dep: 06/09/1958.    
26/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 26/04/1960. Dep: 04/06/1960.    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63655 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev