Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 108 Today
» 936 Yesterday
» 2969 Week
» 20305 Month
» 298101 Year
» 1182482 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1617 m/e 06/1918
LNER (1924) 6363   08/03/1924
LNER (1946) 3656   26/12/1946
BR 63656 w/e 19/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 479C
Works Number 5203
To Service During 06/1918
Withdrawal Mon 19/11/1962 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 44 yrs, 5 mths , 19 dys

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 2/12/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 11/03/1924
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 16/03/1924
ARD Ardsley 31/01/1925
CLK Colwick 14/03/1925
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
GOR Gorton 25/06/1945
DON Doncaster 17/02/1946
MEX Mexborough 18/08/1946
40E Langwith Junction 02/07/1950
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 10/09/1950
36D Barnsley 03/12/1950
41F Mexborough 03/01/1960
41H Staveley (G.C.) 02/10/1960
   Withdrawn 19/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster 9w/e 31/03/1946
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 02/07/1950
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 10/09/1950
ALLOC 36D Barnsley m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   25/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1289)
31/01/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1478)
28/03/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1114)
09/12/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1246)
18/07/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3253)
18/07/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
12/11/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3352)
12/04/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 943)
29/05/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3355)
09/02/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3307)
19/06/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3320)
26/01/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22236)
02/10/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22200)
08/11/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22116)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 23/02/1924 08/03/1924 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6363
 
Gorton Works 18/10/1924 31/01/1925 106 days General
Boiler number 1478 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/02/1928 24/03/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 14/03/1931 28/03/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1114 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1933 09/12/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1246 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/07/1936 18/07/1936 8 days General
Boiler number 3253 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1938 12/11/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 3352 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1941 12/04/1941 8 days General
Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/05/1943 29/05/1943 11 days General
Boiler number 3355 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1946 09/02/1946 27 days General
Boiler number 3307 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/05/1948 19/06/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3320 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63656
 
Gorton Works 05/01/1952 26/01/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22236 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/05/1954 22/05/1954 8 days Light Casual
Tender changed
 
Gorton Works 28/08/1954 02/10/1954 36 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22200 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1955 22/10/1955 36 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 26/10/1955 27/10/1955 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 11/10/1958 08/11/1958 29 days General
Boiler number 22116 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1617
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5203
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
23/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1924. Dep: 08/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6363
   
11/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
16/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
18/10/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1924. Dep: 31/01/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1478 (Diagram 15)
   
31/01/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
14/03/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
11/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1928. Dep: 24/03/1928.    
14/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1931. Dep: 28/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1114 (Diagram 15)
   
25/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1933. Dep: 09/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1246 (Diagram 15)
   
11/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1936. Dep: 18/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3253 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
29/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1938. Dep: 12/11/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3352 (Diagram 15)
   
05/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1941. Dep: 12/04/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15)
   
19/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1943. Dep: 29/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3355 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1946. Dep: 09/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3307 (Diagram 15)
   
17/02/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
26/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3656    
29/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1948. Dep: 19/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3320 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63656
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
10/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
03/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
05/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1952. Dep: 26/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22236 (Diagram 15)
   
15/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/05/1954. Dep: 22/05/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tender changed
   
15/08/1954 Sightings Gorton Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works. RO 9/1954 Link
28/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/08/1954. Dep: 02/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22200 (Diagram 15)
   
17/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/09/1955. Dep: 22/10/1955.    
26/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/10/1955. Dep: 27/10/1955.    
11/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1958. Dep: 08/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22116 (Diagram 15)
   
03/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
02/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
19/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63656 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev