Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 236 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 236 Week
» 17572 Month
» 295368 Year
» 1179749 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1618 m/e 06/1918
LNER (1924) 6546   25/06/1927
LNER (1946) 3657   12/01/1947
BR 63657 m/e 31/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 479C
Works Number 5204
To Service During 06/1918
Taken into Stock 27/06/1927
Withdrawal Sun 23/09/1962 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
Service Life 44 yrs, 3 mths , 23 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Round Oak Steel, Brierley Hill, 4/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster 27/06/1927
CLK Colwick 05/09/1943
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
MEX Mexborough 18/08/1946
DON Doncaster 20/10/1947
40B Immingham 25/06/1950
38A Colwick 20/09/1953
   Withdrawn 23/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   23/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1101)
18/07/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 930)
02/06/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1112)
20/06/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
18/06/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3227)
24/08/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 864)
06/02/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3412)
30/06/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1133)
20/12/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3360)
16/12/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22142)
28/02/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22135)
24/09/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22120)
07/06/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22213)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/04/1927 25/06/1927 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6546
 
Gorton Works 13/07/1929 17/08/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 27/06/1931 18/07/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/05/1934 02/06/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1112 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/05/1936 20/06/1936 22 days General
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1938 18/06/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 3227 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1940 24/08/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 864 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/01/1943 06/02/1943 22 days General
Boiler number 3412 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1945 30/06/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 1133 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/11/1947 20/12/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 3360 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1950 16/12/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 22142 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63657
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1950 24/12/1950 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 04/01/1951 05/01/1951 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 14/02/1953 28/02/1953 15 days General
Boiler number 22135 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/03/1953 09/03/1953 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 13/08/1955 24/09/1955 43 days General
Boiler number 22120 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1958 07/06/1958 36 days General
Boiler number 22213 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/06/1958 17/06/1958 8 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 03/07/1958 05/07/1958 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 09/04/1960 16/04/1960 8 days Unclassified
Water Treatment fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1618
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5204
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
02/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1927. Dep: 25/06/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6546
   
27/06/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
27/06/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
13/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1929. Dep: 17/08/1929.    
27/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1931. Dep: 18/07/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15)
   
19/05/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1934. Dep: 02/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1112 (Diagram 15)
   
30/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1936. Dep: 20/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
04/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1938. Dep: 18/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3227 (Diagram 15)
   
17/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1940. Dep: 24/08/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 864 (Diagram 15)
   
16/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1943. Dep: 06/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3412 (Diagram 15)
   
05/09/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
09/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1945. Dep: 30/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1133 (Diagram 15)
   
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
12/01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3657    
20/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
22/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1947. Dep: 20/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3360 (Diagram 15)
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
02/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1950. Dep: 16/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22142 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63657
   
20/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1950. Dep: 24/12/1950.    
04/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/01/1951. Dep: 05/01/1951.    
14/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1953. Dep: 28/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22135 (Diagram 15)
   
03/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/03/1953. Dep: 09/03/1953.    
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
13/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1955. Dep: 24/09/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22120 (Diagram 15)
   
03/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1958. Dep: 07/06/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22213 (Diagram 15)
   
10/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/06/1958. Dep: 17/06/1958.    
03/07/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/07/1958. Dep: 05/07/1958.    
09/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1960. Dep: 16/04/1960.
Work undertaken:
Water Treatment fitted
   
23/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63657 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev