|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/02/1924 | 12/04/1924 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6368 |
||
Gorton Works | 31/07/1926 | 16/10/1926 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1435 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/12/1928 | 02/02/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/05/1931 | 13/06/1931 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1358 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/12/1933 | 06/01/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 111 (Diagram 15) Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles |
||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1936 | 09/05/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1938 | 17/09/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1941 | 29/03/1941 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1046 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1619 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5205 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
02/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 12/04/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6368 |
||
10/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
12/04/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
10/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
31/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1926. Dep: 16/10/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1435 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1928. Dep: 02/02/1929. | ||
16/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1931. Dep: 13/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1358 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1933. Dep: 06/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 111 (Diagram 15) Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles |
||
15/02/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
25/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1936. Dep: 09/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1938. Dep: 17/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1941. Dep: 29/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1046 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 715 from Colwick (CLK) | ||
13/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 715 |