Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 225 Today
» 1292 Yesterday
» 2743 Week
» 22388 Month
» 57030 Year
» 1278595 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1620 m/e 07/1918
LNER (1924) 6360   23/02/1924
LNER (1946) 3659   05/01/1947
BR 63659   06/05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 479C
Works Number 5206
To Service During 07/1918
Taken into Stock 23/02/1924
Withdrawal Sun 09/12/1962 off Mexborough (41F)
Scrapping Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
Service Life 44 yrs, 5 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Round Oak Steel, Brierley Hill, 3/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 29/02/1924
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 29/03/1924
DON Doncaster 22/11/1924
MAR March 24/10/1931
DON Doncaster 24/12/1931
CAM Cambridge 12/08/1932
DON Doncaster 29/08/1932
MEX Mexborough 18/08/1946
DON Doncaster 20/10/1947
FRO Frodingham 18/01/1948
36D Barnsley 13/11/1955
41F Mexborough 03/01/1960
   Withdrawn 09/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 36D Barnsley 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 23/01/1960
WDN   09/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1247)
15/11/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1196)
02/11/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1238)
25/07/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1947)
05/05/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 807)
20/06/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
20/06/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3246)
30/07/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3339)
19/10/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3240)
10/07/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1118)
21/04/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3403)
13/12/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3250)
06/05/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1149)
20/11/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22288)
03/05/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22292)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 09/02/1924 23/02/1924 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6360
 
Gorton Works 16/08/1924 15/11/1924 92 days General
Boiler number 1196 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/07/1927 27/08/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 05/10/1929 02/11/1929 29 days General
Boiler number 1238 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/07/1931 25/07/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1947 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/04/1934 05/05/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/06/1936 20/06/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 3246 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 23/07/1938 30/07/1938 8 days General
Boiler number 3339 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/10/1940 19/10/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1943 10/07/1943 15 days General
Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/04/1945 21/04/1945 15 days General
Boiler number 3403 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/11/1947 13/12/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 3250 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/04/1950 06/05/1950 22 days General
Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63659
 
Gorton Works 10/05/1950 11/05/1950 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 05/07/1952 09/08/1952 36 days General  
Gorton Works 17/08/1952 19/08/1952 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 23/10/1954 20/11/1954 29 days General
Boiler number 22288 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/03/1958 03/05/1958 36 days General
Boiler number 22292 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1620
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5206
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 23/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6360
   
23/02/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
29/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
29/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
16/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1924. Dep: 15/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1196 (Diagram 15)
   
22/11/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
16/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1927. Dep: 27/08/1927.    
05/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1929. Dep: 02/11/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1238 (Diagram 15)
   
04/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1931. Dep: 25/07/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1947 (Diagram 15)
   
24/10/1931 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
24/12/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
12/08/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
29/08/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
21/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1934. Dep: 05/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15)
   
06/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1936. Dep: 20/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3246 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
23/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1938. Dep: 30/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3339 (Diagram 15)
   
12/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1940. Dep: 19/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 15)
   
26/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1943. Dep: 10/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15)
   
07/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3403 (Diagram 15)
   
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
05/01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3659    
20/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
22/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1947. Dep: 13/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3250 (Diagram 15)
   
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
15/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1950. Dep: 06/05/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63659
   
10/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/05/1950. Dep: 11/05/1950.    
05/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1952. Dep: 09/08/1952.    
17/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/08/1952. Dep: 19/08/1952.    
23/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1954. Dep: 20/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22288 (Diagram 15)
   
13/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
29/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1958. Dep: 03/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22292 (Diagram 15)
   
03/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
09/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63659 from Mexborough (41F)    

prev prev