|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 09/02/1924 | 23/02/1924 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6360 |
||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1924 | 15/11/1924 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 1196 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/07/1927 | 27/08/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1929 | 02/11/1929 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1238 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/07/1931 | 25/07/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1947 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/04/1934 | 05/05/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1936 | 20/06/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3246 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/07/1938 | 30/07/1938 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3339 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/10/1940 | 19/10/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1943 | 10/07/1943 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/04/1945 | 21/04/1945 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3403 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/11/1947 | 13/12/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3250 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/04/1950 | 06/05/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63659 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1950 | 11/05/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 05/07/1952 | 09/08/1952 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1952 | 19/08/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1954 | 20/11/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22288 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1958 | 03/05/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22292 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1620 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5206 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 23/02/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6360 |
||
23/02/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
29/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
29/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
16/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1924. Dep: 15/11/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1196 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/11/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
16/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1927. Dep: 27/08/1927. | ||
05/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1929. Dep: 02/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1238 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1931. Dep: 25/07/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1947 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/10/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
24/12/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
12/08/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
29/08/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
21/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1934. Dep: 05/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1936. Dep: 20/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3246 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
23/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1938. Dep: 30/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3339 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1940. Dep: 19/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1943. Dep: 10/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3403 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
05/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3659 | ||
20/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
22/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1947. Dep: 13/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3250 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
24/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
15/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1950. Dep: 06/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63659 |
||
10/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/05/1950. Dep: 11/05/1950. | ||
05/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1952. Dep: 09/08/1952. | ||
17/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/08/1952. Dep: 19/08/1952. | ||
23/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1954. Dep: 20/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22288 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/11/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) | ||
29/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1958. Dep: 03/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22292 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
09/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63659 from Mexborough (41F) |