|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1925 | 01/08/1925 | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6540 |
|||
Gorton Works | 1928 | 21/04/1928 | General | ||||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1930 | 11/1930 | General | Boiler number 1745 (Diagram 15) |
|||
Gorton Works | 22/07/1933 | 07/1933 | General | ||||
Gorton Works | 12/09/1935 | 30/09/1935 | 19 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/03/1938 | 04/1938 | General | Boiler number 3324 (Diagram 15) |
|||
Gorton Works | 19/07/1940 | 03/08/1940 | 16 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3673 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/08/1942 | 10/10/1942 | 45 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1944 | 07/04/1944 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 3670 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1946 | 28/09/1946 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 22313 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/11/1948 | 11/12/1948 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 5101 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63661 |
||
Gorton Works | 06/01/1952 | 02/02/1952 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 22328 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/02/1952 | 07/02/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1954 | 19/06/1954 | 33 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 16/02/1957 | 23/03/1957 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22318 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/07/1961 | 14/09/1961 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 22312 (Diagram 15D) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1622 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5208 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1925. Dep: 01/08/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6540 |
||
01/08/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
01/08/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
18/08/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1928. Dep: 21/04/1928. | ||
25/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1930. Dep: ?/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1745 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/1933 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 1140 boiler fitted | ||
22/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1933. Dep: ?/07/1933. | ||
09/1935 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 1745 boiler fitted | ||
12/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1935. Dep: 30/09/1935. | ||
25/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1938. Dep: ?/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3324 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1940. Dep: 03/08/1940. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3673 (Diagram 15D) |
||
23/11/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
30/07/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
27/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942. | ||
12/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1944. Dep: 07/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3670 (Diagram 15D) |
||
03/02/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
29/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1946. Dep: 28/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22313 (Diagram 15D) |
||
10/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3661 | ||
07/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1948. Dep: 11/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5101 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63661 |
||
06/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1952. Dep: 02/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22328 (Diagram 15D) |
||
05/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/02/1952. Dep: 07/02/1952. | ||
18/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/05/1954. Dep: 19/06/1954. | ||
16/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1957. Dep: 23/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22318 (Diagram 15D) |
||
27/03/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
04/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
24/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1961. Dep: 14/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22312 (Diagram 15D) |
||
11/02/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
09/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
20/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
22/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
08/08/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63661 from Frodingham (36C) |