Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 625 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3311 Week
» 4201 Month
» 312182 Year
» 1196563 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1624 m/e 08/1918
LNER (1924) 6358   23/02/1924
LNER (1946) 3662   08/12/1946
BR 63662 w/e 29/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/308/1918
O4/721/05/1942
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 479C
Works Number 5210
To Service During 08/1918
Taken into Stock 23/02/1924
Withdrawal Thu 18/05/1961 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 42 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 28/02/1924
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 08/03/1924
ARD Ardsley 05/02/1925
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 17/08/1926
STV Staveley (G.C.) 01/01/1935
WFD Woodford Halse 07/05/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 07/04/1946
CLK Colwick 27/10/1946
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
CLK Colwick 08/02/1948
ANN Annesley 06/06/1948
39A Gorton 26/11/1950
36C Frodingham 13/06/1954
   Withdrawn 18/05/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 14/02/1948
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 12/06/1948
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 19/06/1954
WDN   18/05/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1248)
19/07/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1687)
29/03/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1339)
18/03/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 655)
09/03/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 866)
19/06/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 809)
25/11/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3311)
21/05/1942 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3680)
07/08/1943 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3695)
14/04/1945 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3687)
08/03/1947 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3691)
21/10/1950 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22303)
08/11/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22311)
02/07/1955 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22301)
28/06/1958 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22329)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 09/02/1924 23/02/1924 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6358
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1924 19/07/1924 64 days General
Boiler number 1687 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/10/1927 19/11/1927 36 days General  
Gorton Works 08/03/1930 29/03/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1339 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1933 18/03/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 655 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1935 09/03/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 866 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1937 19/06/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 809 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1939 25/11/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 20/03/1942 21/05/1942 63 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3680 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 23/07/1943 07/08/1943 16 days General
Boiler number 3695 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1945 14/04/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 3687 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 15/02/1947 08/03/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 3691 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 22/05/1948 29/05/1948 8 days Heavy
Renumbered to BR 63662
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1949 26/02/1949 43 days General  
Gorton Works 29/10/1949 12/11/1949 15 days Light Casual
Tender only
 
Gorton Works 30/09/1950 21/10/1950 22 days General
Boiler number 22303 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1950 30/10/1950 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 18/10/1952 08/11/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22311 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1952 17/11/1952 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 28/05/1955 02/07/1955 36 days General
Boiler number 22301 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 05/07/1955 06/07/1955 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 11/08/1955 24/09/1955 45 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 24/05/1958 28/06/1958 36 days General
Boiler number 22329 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 09/05/1961 09/05/1961 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1624
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5210
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 23/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6358
   
23/02/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
28/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
08/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
17/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1924. Dep: 19/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1687 (Diagram 15)
   
05/02/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
17/08/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
15/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1927. Dep: 19/11/1927.    
08/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1930. Dep: 29/03/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1339 (Diagram 15)
   
04/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1933. Dep: 18/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 655 (Diagram 15)
   
01/01/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
02/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1935. Dep: 09/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 866 (Diagram 15)
   
05/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1937. Dep: 19/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 809 (Diagram 15)
   
11/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1939. Dep: 25/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 15)
   
20/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1942. Dep: 21/05/1942.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3680 (Diagram 15D)
   
23/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1943. Dep: 07/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3695 (Diagram 15D)
   
07/05/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
24/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1945. Dep: 14/04/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3687 (Diagram 15D)
   
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
08/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3662    
15/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3691 (Diagram 15D)
   
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
08/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
22/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 22/05/1948. Dep: 29/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63662
   
06/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
15/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1949. Dep: 26/02/1949.    
29/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/10/1949. Dep: 12/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
Tender only
   
30/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1950. Dep: 21/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22303 (Diagram 15D)
   
28/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/10/1950. Dep: 30/10/1950.    
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
18/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1952. Dep: 08/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22311 (Diagram 15D)
   
11/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/11/1952. Dep: 17/11/1952.    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
28/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1955. Dep: 02/07/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22301 (Diagram 15D)
   
05/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/07/1955. Dep: 06/07/1955.    
11/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/08/1955. Dep: 24/09/1955.    
24/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1958. Dep: 28/06/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22329 (Diagram 15D)
   
09/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 09/05/1961. Dep: 09/05/1961.    
18/05/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 63662 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev