Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 188 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4356 Week
» 19470 Month
» 322660 Year
» 1544225 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1625 m/e 08/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6359   02/02/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3663   02/11/1946
British Railways 63663 w/e 06/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/308/1918
O116/06/1945
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 479C
Works Number 5211
To Service During 08/1918
Taken into Stock 02/02/1924
Withdrawal Sun 01/11/1964 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Service Life 46 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T J Thomson's, Stockton-on-Tees, 12/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1918
GOR Gorton on 02/02/1924
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 14/02/1924
DON Doncaster on 11/11/1924
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 12/12/1943
GOR Gorton on 08/07/1945
CLK Colwick on 18/08/1946
GOR Gorton on 20/10/1946
38B Annesley on 26/11/1950
31B March on 24/02/1957
41H Staveley (G.C.) on 22/11/1959
40E Colwick on 07/10/1962
41H Staveley (G.C.) on 09/06/1963
   Withdrawn on 01/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 40E Colwick w/e 25/10/1962
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 29/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1196)
25/10/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1204)
12/10/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 546)
12/12/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1181)
21/07/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 930)
29/08/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1272)
29/08/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
05/11/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3259)
07/12/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1062)
03/07/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3235)
16/06/1945 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5038)
31/05/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5105)
06/08/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5036)
06/08/1949 Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
09/02/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28824)
28/11/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28316)
24/12/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28283)
05/10/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28812)
09/06/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28809)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/02/1924 02/02/1924 1 day Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6359
 
Gorton Works 02/08/1924 25/10/1924 85 days General
Boiler number 1204 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1927 07/05/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 10/08/1929 12/10/1929 64 days General
Boiler number 546 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/11/1931 12/12/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/07/1934 21/07/1934 8 days General
Altered to 13ft gauge
Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/08/1936 29/08/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1272 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1938 05/11/1938 8 days General
Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1940 07/12/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1943 03/07/1943 8 days General
Boiler number 3235 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1945 16/06/1945 78 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5038 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1947 31/05/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 5105 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1949 06/08/1949 43 days General
Boiler number 5036 (Diagram 100A)
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
Renumbered to BR 63663
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1952 09/02/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 28824 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1952 17/05/1952 15 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 14/11/1953 28/11/1953 15 days General
Boiler number 28316 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1955 05/02/1955 22 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 19/11/1955 24/12/1955 36 days General
Boiler number 28283 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1957 05/10/1957 22 days General
Boiler number 28812 (Diagram 100A)
 
Doncaster Works 24/04/1962 09/06/1962 47 days General
Boiler number 28809 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1625
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5211
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
02/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
02/02/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
02/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 02/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6359
   
14/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
02/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1924. Dep: 25/10/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1204 (Diagram 15)
   
11/11/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
26/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1927. Dep: 07/05/1927.    
10/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1929. Dep: 12/10/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 546 (Diagram 15)
   
21/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1931. Dep: 12/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15)
   
14/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1934. Dep: 21/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Altered to 13ft gauge
Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15)
   
15/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1936. Dep: 29/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1272 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
29/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1938. Dep: 05/11/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15)
   
30/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1940. Dep: 07/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15)
   
26/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1943. Dep: 03/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3235 (Diagram 15)
   
12/12/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
31/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1945. Dep: 16/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5038 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
02/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3663    
03/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1947. Dep: 31/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5105 (Diagram 100A)
   
25/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1949. Dep: 06/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5036 (Diagram 100A)
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted
Renumbered to BR 63663
   
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
19/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1952. Dep: 09/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28824 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/05/1952. Dep: 17/05/1952.    
14/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28316 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/01/1955. Dep: 05/02/1955.    
19/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1955. Dep: 24/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28283 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
14/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1957. Dep: 05/10/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28812 (Diagram 100A)
   
22/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
24/04/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1962. Dep: 09/06/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28809 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
09/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
01/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63663 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev