|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/02/1924 | 02/02/1924 | 1 day | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6359 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/08/1924 | 25/10/1924 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 1204 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/03/1927 | 07/05/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1929 | 12/10/1929 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 546 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/11/1931 | 12/12/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/07/1934 | 21/07/1934 | 8 days | General | Altered to 13ft gauge Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/08/1936 | 29/08/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1272 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/10/1938 | 05/11/1938 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1940 | 07/12/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1943 | 03/07/1943 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3235 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1945 | 16/06/1945 | 78 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5038 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1947 | 31/05/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 5105 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1949 | 06/08/1949 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 5036 (Diagram 100A) Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted Renumbered to BR 63663 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1952 | 09/02/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28824 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1952 | 17/05/1952 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 14/11/1953 | 28/11/1953 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 28316 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1955 | 05/02/1955 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 19/11/1955 | 24/12/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28283 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/09/1957 | 05/10/1957 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28812 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/04/1962 | 09/06/1962 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28809 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1625 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5211 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
02/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
02/02/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
02/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 02/02/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6359 |
||
14/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
02/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1924. Dep: 25/10/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1204 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/11/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
26/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1927. Dep: 07/05/1927. | ||
10/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1929. Dep: 12/10/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 546 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1931. Dep: 12/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1934. Dep: 21/07/1934. Work undertaken: Altered to 13ft gauge Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1936. Dep: 29/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1272 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
29/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1938. Dep: 05/11/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3259 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1940. Dep: 07/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1943. Dep: 03/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3235 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
31/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1945. Dep: 16/06/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5038 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
02/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3663 | ||
03/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1947. Dep: 31/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5105 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1949. Dep: 06/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5036 (Diagram 100A) Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted Renumbered to BR 63663 |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
19/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1952. Dep: 09/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28824 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/05/1952. Dep: 17/05/1952. | ||
14/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28316 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/01/1955. Dep: 05/02/1955. | ||
19/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1955. Dep: 24/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28283 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
14/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1957. Dep: 05/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28812 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
24/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1962. Dep: 09/06/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28809 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/10/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
09/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
01/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63663 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |