Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 131 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4262 Week
» 14432 Month
» 292228 Year
» 1176609 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1626 m/e 08/1918
LNER (1924) 6541   22/08/1925
War Dept. 751   19/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 479C
Works Number 5212
To Service During 08/1918
Taken into Stock 22/08/1925
Withdrawal Fri 19/09/1941 off Colwick (CLK)
Service Life 23 yrs, 1 mth , 19 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 751 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 20/08/1925
NWE New England 02/09/1925
CLK Colwick 19/10/1932
   Withdrawn 19/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1206)
21/06/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1417)
12/11/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1493)
16/02/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 940)
15/05/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1478)
30/09/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3379)
27/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 820)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 30/05/1925 22/08/1925 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6541
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1927 11/02/1928 50 days General  
Gorton Works 24/05/1930 21/06/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 1417 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1932 12/11/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1493 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1935 16/02/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 940 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/05/1937 15/05/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1478 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1939 30/09/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3379 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/09/1941 27/09/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 820 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 751
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1626
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5212
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
30/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1925. Dep: 22/08/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6541
   
20/08/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/08/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
02/09/1925 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
24/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1927. Dep: 11/02/1928.    
24/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1930. Dep: 21/06/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1417 (Diagram 15)
   
19/10/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
29/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1932. Dep: 12/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1493 (Diagram 15)
   
02/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1935. Dep: 16/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 940 (Diagram 15)
   
01/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1937. Dep: 15/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1478 (Diagram 15)
   
16/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1939. Dep: 30/09/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3379 (Diagram 15)
   
13/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1941. Dep: 27/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 820 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 751
   
19/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 751 from Colwick (CLK)    

prev prev