Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 942 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 5073 Week
» 15243 Month
» 293039 Year
» 1177420 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1627 m/e 09/1918
LNER (1924) 6357   15/03/1924
LNER (1946) 3665   22/09/1946
BR 63665 w/e 28/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 479C
Works Number 5213
To Service During 09/1918
Taken into Stock 15/03/1924
Withdrawal Tue 17/12/1963 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
Service Life 45 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Round Oak Steel, Brierley Hill, 1/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 20/03/1924
ARD Ardsley 05/02/1925
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 30/08/1926
STV Staveley (G.C.) 01/01/1935
WFD Woodford Halse 10/08/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 07/04/1946
40B Immingham 24/07/1955
40D Tuxford 26/02/1956
41J Langwith Junction 01/02/1959
36C Frodingham 06/08/1959
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 31/01/1960
   Withdrawn 17/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 5w/e 31/03/1956
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 05/09/1959
WDN   17/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1302)
21/08/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1368)
07/06/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1521)
27/06/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1184)
13/01/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 865)
02/02/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1106)
12/06/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1276)
03/11/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 814)
17/01/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1965)
29/01/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3325)
06/10/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3336)
28/01/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3319)
09/08/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22281)
05/10/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22285)
29/09/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22191)
03/05/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22247)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 08/03/1924 15/03/1924 8 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6357
 
Gorton Works 24/05/1924 21/08/1924 90 days General
Boiler number 1368 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/05/1928 07/06/1928 20 days General
Boiler number 1521 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/05/1930 27/06/1930 35 days General
Boiler number 1184 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/12/1932 13/01/1933 35 days General
Boiler number 865 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1934 02/02/1935 34 days General
Boiler number 1106 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1937 12/06/1937 55 days General
Boiler number 1276 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/08/1939 03/11/1939 66 days General
Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1941 17/01/1942 21 days General
Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1944 29/01/1944 18 days General
Boiler number 3325 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/08/1947 06/10/1947 40 days General
Boiler number 3336 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1949 28/01/1950 40 days General
Boiler number 3319 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63665
 
Gorton Works 15/02/1950 16/02/1950 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 19/06/1952 09/08/1952 52 days General
Boiler number 22281 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/08/1954 05/10/1954 44 days General
Boiler number 22285 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/10/1954 08/10/1954 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 28/08/1956 29/09/1956 33 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22191 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/10/1956 03/10/1956 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 23/11/1956 22/12/1956 30 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 17/03/1958 03/05/1958 48 days General
Boiler number 22247 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/05/1958 15/05/1958 9 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 31/08/1960 01/10/1960 32 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 12/04/1961 26/04/1961 15 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1627
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5213
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
08/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1924. Dep: 15/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6357
   
15/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
20/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
24/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1924. Dep: 21/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1368 (Diagram 15)
   
05/02/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
30/08/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
19/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1928. Dep: 07/06/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1521 (Diagram 15)
   
24/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1930. Dep: 27/06/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1184 (Diagram 15)
   
10/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1932. Dep: 13/01/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 865 (Diagram 15)
   
31/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1934. Dep: 02/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1106 (Diagram 15)
   
01/01/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
19/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1937. Dep: 12/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1276 (Diagram 15)
   
30/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1939. Dep: 03/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15)
   
28/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1941. Dep: 17/01/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15)
   
12/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1944. Dep: 29/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3325 (Diagram 15)
   
10/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
22/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3665    
28/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1947. Dep: 06/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3336 (Diagram 15)
   
20/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1949. Dep: 28/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3319 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63665
   
15/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/02/1950. Dep: 16/02/1950.    
19/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1952. Dep: 09/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22281 (Diagram 15)
   
23/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1954. Dep: 05/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22285 (Diagram 15)
   
07/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/10/1954. Dep: 08/10/1954.    
24/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
26/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
28/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/08/1956. Dep: 29/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22191 (Diagram 15)
   
02/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/10/1956. Dep: 03/10/1956.    
23/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/11/1956. Dep: 22/12/1956.    
17/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1958. Dep: 03/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22247 (Diagram 15)
   
07/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/05/1958. Dep: 15/05/1958.    
01/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
06/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
31/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
31/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 31/08/1960. Dep: 01/10/1960.    
12/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/04/1961. Dep: 26/04/1961.    
17/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63665 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev