Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 466 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 466 Week
» 17802 Month
» 295598 Year
» 1179979 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1628 m/e 09/1918
LNER (1924) 6542   24/10/1925
LNER (1946) 3666   08/09/1946
BR 63666 w/e 15/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 479C
Works Number 5214
To Service During 09/1918
Taken into Stock 24/10/1925
Withdrawal Sat 15/12/1962 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 44 yrs, 3 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 27/8/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 22/10/1925
WFD Woodford Halse 05/11/1925
NEA Neasden 18/12/1928
MEX Mexborough 13/01/1936
40E Langwith Junction 02/07/1950
36B Mexborough 10/09/1950
40B Immingham 22/09/1952
36B Mexborough 05/10/1952
36C Frodingham 27/12/1959
   Withdrawn 15/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 02/07/1950
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 10/09/1950
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 23/01/1960
WDN   15/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1042)
16/05/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1160)
28/07/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1040)
07/08/1937 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
07/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1431)
22/06/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3248)
10/07/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1318)
22/12/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3329)
15/05/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3377)
23/06/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22195)
25/09/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22219)
31/05/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22885)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 18/07/1925 24/10/1925 99 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6542
 
Gorton Works 03/12/1927 21/01/1928 50 days General  
Gorton Works 25/04/1931 16/05/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 1160 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/07/1934 28/07/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 1040 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/07/1937 07/08/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1431 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 15/06/1940 22/06/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 3248 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1943 10/07/1943 15 days General
Boiler number 1318 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1945 22/12/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 3329 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/04/1948 15/05/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3377 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63666
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1951 23/06/1951 15 days General
Boiler number 22195 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1951 18/07/1951 11 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 28/08/1954 25/09/1954 29 days General
Boiler number 22219 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/04/1958 31/05/1958 36 days General
Boiler number 22885 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1628
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5214
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
18/07/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1925. Dep: 24/10/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6542
   
22/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
24/10/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
05/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
03/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1927. Dep: 21/01/1928.    
18/12/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
25/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1931. Dep: 16/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1160 (Diagram 15)
   
07/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1934. Dep: 28/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1040 (Diagram 15)
   
13/01/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
24/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1937. Dep: 07/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1431 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
15/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1940. Dep: 22/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3248 (Diagram 15)
   
26/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1943. Dep: 10/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1318 (Diagram 15)
   
01/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1945. Dep: 22/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3329 (Diagram 15)
   
08/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3666    
24/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1948. Dep: 15/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3377 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63666
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
10/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
09/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1951. Dep: 23/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22195 (Diagram 15)
   
08/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/07/1951. Dep: 18/07/1951.    
22/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
05/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
28/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1954. Dep: 25/09/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22219 (Diagram 15)
   
26/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1958. Dep: 31/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22885 (Diagram 15)
   
27/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
15/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63666 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev