|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/01/1924 | 09/02/1924 | 36 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6367 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/05/1926 | 18/09/1926 | 113 days | General | Boiler number 1757 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/03/1928 | 07/04/1928 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 04/01/1930 | 25/01/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1196 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/04/1932 | 09/04/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1692 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/11/1934 | 08/12/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1174 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1937 | 17/07/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3303 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/07/1939 | 29/07/1939 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 549 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/12/1941 | 20/12/1941 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 3243 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/01/1944 | 29/01/1944 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 3253 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1945 | 15/09/1945 | 36 days | Heavy | Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/02/1947 | 01/03/1947 | 15 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 29/11/1947 | 20/12/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/05/1950 | 03/06/1950 | 15 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63667 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/07/1952 | 16/08/1952 | 22 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1953 | 22/08/1953 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22176 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/08/1953 | 04/09/1953 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1956 | 11/02/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22876 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1956 | 21/02/1956 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1958 | 25/10/1958 | 15 days | Unclassified | Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 02/01/1959 | 02/01/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1629 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5215 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
06/1920 | Allocation | |||
06/1920 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2956 | ||
05/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1924. Dep: 09/02/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6367 |
||
09/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
09/02/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
29/05/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1926. Dep: 18/09/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1757 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1928. Dep: 07/04/1928. | ||
04/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1930. Dep: 25/01/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1196 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1932. Dep: 09/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1692 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1934. Dep: 08/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1174 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/01/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
03/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1937. Dep: 17/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3303 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1939. Dep: 29/07/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 549 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
01/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1941. Dep: 20/12/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3243 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1944. Dep: 29/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3253 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
11/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 11/08/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3667 | ||
08/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
15/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 15/02/1947. Dep: 01/03/1947. | ||
29/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1947. Dep: 20/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
20/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1950. Dep: 03/06/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63667 |
||
22/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
28/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
26/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 26/07/1952. Dep: 16/08/1952. | ||
08/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1953. Dep: 22/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22176 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/08/1953. Dep: 04/09/1953. | ||
14/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1956. Dep: 11/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22876 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/02/1956. Dep: 21/02/1956. | ||
11/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/10/1958. Dep: 25/10/1958. Work undertaken: Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
02/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 02/01/1959. Dep: 02/01/1959. | ||
19/01/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63667 from Langwith Junction (41J) |