Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 776 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 776 Week
» 18112 Month
» 295908 Year
» 1180289 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1631 m/e 10/1918
LNER (1924) 6361   10/05/1924
LNER (1946) 3668   07/09/1946
BR 63668 w/e 02/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Kitson
Order Number 479C
Works Number 5217
To Service During 10/1918
Taken into Stock 23/02/1924
Withdrawal Tue 02/12/1958 off Mexborough (41F)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 40 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys

Notes
Notes There is a possibility that this engine had a 'c' suffix in the period 23/2/24 to 10/5/24 at which date it had 5000 added to its number
Into Gorton for cutting up 6/12/58

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 25/02/1924
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 16/05/1924
CLK Colwick 24/01/1925
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
FRO Frodingham 02/12/1945
DON Doncaster 07/04/1946
FRO Frodingham 18/01/1948
MEX Mexborough 02/02/1948
   Withdrawn 02/12/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FRO Frodingham m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 28/02/1948
WDN   02/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1224)
10/05/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1165)
05/05/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 870)
21/02/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1246)
21/10/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1243)
16/05/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
16/05/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1046)
03/09/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1198)
23/11/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 930)
29/05/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3347)
29/04/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3274)
07/09/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3296)
02/07/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3293)
01/12/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22232)
04/06/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22286)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 09/02/1924 23/02/1924 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 22/03/1924 10/05/1924 50 days General
Boiler number 1165 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6361
 
Gorton Works 29/08/1925 24/10/1925 57 days General  
Gorton Works 31/03/1928 05/05/1928 36 days General
Boiler number 870 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1928 15/12/1928 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 07/02/1931 21/02/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1246 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/10/1933 21/10/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1243 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/05/1936 16/05/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1046 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1938 03/09/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 1198 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/11/1940 23/11/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 08/04/1943 29/05/1943 52 days General
Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1944 29/04/1944 18 days General
Boiler number 3274 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1946 07/09/1946 15 days General
Boiler number 3296 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3668
 
Gorton Works 18/06/1949 02/07/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 3293 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63668
 
Gorton Works 12/11/1951 01/12/1951 20 days General
Boiler number 22232 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1951 08/12/1951 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 14/05/1955 04/06/1955 22 days General
Boiler number 22286 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1956 10/03/1956 22 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1631
Built at Kitson, Works Number 5217
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 23/02/1924.    
23/02/1924 To Stock To ROD stock    
25/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1924. Dep: 10/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1165 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6361
   
16/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
24/01/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
29/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1925. Dep: 24/10/1925.    
31/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1928. Dep: 05/05/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 870 (Diagram 15)
   
08/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/12/1928. Dep: 15/12/1928.    
07/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1931. Dep: 21/02/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1246 (Diagram 15)
   
14/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1933. Dep: 21/10/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1243 (Diagram 15)
   
02/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1936. Dep: 16/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1046 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
20/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1938. Dep: 03/09/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1198 (Diagram 15)
   
16/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1940. Dep: 23/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15)
   
08/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1943. Dep: 29/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
12/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1944. Dep: 29/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3274 (Diagram 15)
   
02/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
24/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1946. Dep: 07/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3296 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3668
   
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
02/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
18/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1949. Dep: 02/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3293 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63668
   
12/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1951. Dep: 01/12/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22232 (Diagram 15)
   
06/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/12/1951. Dep: 08/12/1951.    
14/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1955. Dep: 04/06/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22286 (Diagram 15)
   
18/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/02/1956. Dep: 10/03/1956.    
02/12/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 63668 from Mexborough (41F)    

prev prev