Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 233 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 233 Week
» 17569 Month
» 295365 Year
» 1179746 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1671 m/e 03/1918
LNWR 2971 m/e 06/1920
LNER (1924) 6341   31/05/1924
LNER (1946) 3689   11/11/1946
BR 63689 w/e 08/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/303/1918
O111/08/1945
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E105
Works Number 3715
To Service During 03/1918
Taken into Stock 31/05/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Service Life 44 yrs, 8 mths , 19 dys

Notes
Notes Into Crewe for cutting up 9/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   06/1920
GOR Gorton 29/05/1924
CLK Colwick 18/08/1946
GOR Gorton 20/10/1946
38B Annesley 16/07/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 16/07/1950
LOAN 16D Annesley 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1211)
19/10/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1486)
11/07/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 515)
24/06/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1494)
06/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1235)
28/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3208)
03/02/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3381)
26/09/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3331)
11/08/1945 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5041)
07/08/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5034)
08/10/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5084)
26/05/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28812)
28/02/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28284)
07/04/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28257)
13/04/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28390)
12/04/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28383)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 29/03/1924 31/05/1924 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6341
 
Gorton Works 28/05/1927 09/07/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 31/08/1929 19/10/1929 50 days General
Boiler number 1486 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1931 11/07/1931 22 days General
Boiler number 515 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/06/1933 24/06/1933 8 days General
Boiler number 1494 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1935 06/07/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1235 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1937 28/08/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 3208 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/01/1940 03/02/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 3381 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/09/1942 26/09/1942 12 days General
Boiler number 3331 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1945 11/08/1945 71 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5041 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1947 07/08/1947 33 days General
Boiler number 5034 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 05/09/1949 08/10/1949 34 days General
Boiler number 5084 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63689
 
Gorton Works 22/04/1951 26/05/1951 35 days General
Boiler number 28812 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 30/05/1951 03/06/1951 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 05/02/1953 28/02/1953 24 days General
Boiler number 28284 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 20/04/1953 09/05/1953 20 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 24/03/1954 23/04/1954 31 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 02/03/1955 07/04/1955 37 days General
Boiler number 28257 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1955 02/07/1955 17 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 05/03/1956 20/04/1956 47 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 13/03/1957 13/04/1957 32 days General
Boiler number 28390 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 09/07/1959 21/08/1959 44 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 08/09/1959 11/09/1959 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 15/06/1960 08/07/1960 24 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 02/03/1962 12/04/1962 42 days General
Boiler number 28383 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1671
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3715
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
06/1920 Allocation      
06/1920 Renumbered Renumbered to 2971    
29/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1924. Dep: 31/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6341
   
29/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
31/05/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
28/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1927. Dep: 09/07/1927.    
31/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1929. Dep: 19/10/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1486 (Diagram 15)
   
20/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1931. Dep: 11/07/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 515 (Diagram 15)
   
17/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1933. Dep: 24/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1494 (Diagram 15)
   
22/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1935. Dep: 06/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1235 (Diagram 15)
   
14/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1937. Dep: 28/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3208 (Diagram 15)
   
27/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1940. Dep: 03/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3381 (Diagram 15)
   
15/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3331 (Diagram 15)
   
02/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1945. Dep: 11/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5041 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
11/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3689    
06/07/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1947. Dep: 07/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5034 (Diagram 100A)
   
05/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1949. Dep: 08/10/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5084 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63689
   
16/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
22/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1951. Dep: 26/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28812 (Diagram 100A)
   
30/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/05/1951. Dep: 03/06/1951.    
05/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1953. Dep: 28/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28284 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/04/1953. Dep: 09/05/1953.    
24/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/03/1954. Dep: 23/04/1954.    
02/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1955. Dep: 07/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28257 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/06/1955. Dep: 02/07/1955.    
05/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/03/1956. Dep: 20/04/1956.    
13/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1957. Dep: 13/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28390 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/07/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/07/1959. Dep: 21/08/1959.    
08/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/09/1959. Dep: 11/09/1959.    
15/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/06/1960. Dep: 08/07/1960.    
02/03/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1962. Dep: 12/04/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28383 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/03/1962 Sightings Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63689 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev