Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 125 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 2264 Week
» 12434 Month
» 290230 Year
» 1174611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1672 m/e 03/1918
LNER (1924) 6551   01/12/1928
War Dept. 741   20/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E105
Works Number 3716
To Service During 03/1918
Taken into Stock 01/12/1928
Withdrawal Sat 20/09/1941 off Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE)
Service Life 23 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 741 and sent to Middle East via Bidston, 15/10/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DEE Dundee Tay Bridge 01/12/1928
   Withdrawn 20/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1942)
17/12/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1467)
11/05/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1271)
17/04/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3287)
17/06/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1016)
20/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3441)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 14/07/1928 01/12/1928 141 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6551
 
Cowlairs Works 1931 21/11/1931   General  
Gorton Works 10/12/1932 17/12/1932 8 days General
Boiler number C1467 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/03/1933 01/04/1933 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 04/05/1935 11/05/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/03/1937 17/04/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 3287 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1939 17/06/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1941 20/09/1941 13 days General
Boiler number 3441 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 741
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1672
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3716
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
14/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1928. Dep: 01/12/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6551
   
01/12/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE)    
01/12/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1931. Dep: 21/11/1931.    
10/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1932. Dep: 17/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1467 (Diagram 15)
   
25/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/03/1933. Dep: 01/04/1933.    
04/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1935. Dep: 11/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1271 (Diagram 15)
   
27/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1937. Dep: 17/04/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3287 (Diagram 15)
   
27/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1939. Dep: 17/06/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15)
   
08/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3441 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 741
   
20/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 741 from Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE)    

prev prev