Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 731 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3874 Week
» 14044 Month
» 291840 Year
» 1176221 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1674 m/e 04/1918
LNWR 2914 m/e 12/1919
LNER (1924) 6339   19/04/1924
War Dept. 717   14/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E105
Works Number 3718
To Service During 04/1918
Taken into Stock 19/04/1924
Withdrawal Sun 14/09/1941 off Annesley (ANN)
Service Life 23 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 717 and sent to Middle East via Hull, 23/9/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 14/04/1924
IMM Immingham 03/05/1924
CLK Colwick 05/06/1930
ANN Annesley 25/06/1930
   Withdrawn 14/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1960)
12/12/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1069)
07/06/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1756)
26/11/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1510)
09/03/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1078)
06/02/1937 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
06/02/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3273)
13/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3418)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/02/1924 19/04/1924 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6339
 
Gorton Works 31/10/1925 12/12/1925 43 days General
Boiler number 1069 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/12/1927 04/02/1928 57 days General  
Gorton Works 10/05/1930 07/06/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 1756 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/11/1932 26/11/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1510 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1935 09/03/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 1078 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1937 06/02/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 3273 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1939 25/03/1939 22 days General  
Gorton Works 01/09/1941 13/09/1941 13 days General
Boiler number 3418 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1674
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3718
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2914    
08/1921 Allocation      
16/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1924. Dep: 19/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6339
   
14/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
19/04/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
03/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
31/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1925. Dep: 12/12/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1069 (Diagram 15)
   
10/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1927. Dep: 04/02/1928.    
10/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1930. Dep: 07/06/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1756 (Diagram 15)
   
05/06/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
25/06/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
19/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1932. Dep: 26/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1510 (Diagram 15)
   
02/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1935. Dep: 09/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1078 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1937. Dep: 06/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3273 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
04/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1939. Dep: 25/03/1939.    
01/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3418 (Diagram 15)
   
14/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 717 from Annesley (ANN)    
14/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 717    

prev prev