|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 16/02/1924 | 19/04/1924 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6339 |
||
Gorton Works | 31/10/1925 | 12/12/1925 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1069 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/12/1927 | 04/02/1928 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1930 | 07/06/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1756 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/11/1932 | 26/11/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1510 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1935 | 09/03/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1078 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1937 | 06/02/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3273 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/03/1939 | 25/03/1939 | 22 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/09/1941 | 13/09/1941 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 3418 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1674 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3718 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/1919 | Allocation | |||
12/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2914 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
16/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1924. Dep: 19/04/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6339 |
||
14/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
19/04/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
03/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
31/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1925. Dep: 12/12/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1069 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1927. Dep: 04/02/1928. | ||
10/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1930. Dep: 07/06/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1756 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
25/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
19/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1932. Dep: 26/11/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1510 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1935. Dep: 09/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1078 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1937. Dep: 06/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3273 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
04/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1939. Dep: 25/03/1939. | ||
01/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3418 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 717 from Annesley (ANN) | ||
14/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 717 |