Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 736 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6545 Week
» 13729 Month
» 321710 Year
» 1206091 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1675 m/e 04/1918
LNWR 2915 m/e 12/1919
LNER (1924) 6349   28/06/1924
LNER (1946) 3694   05/01/1947
BR 63694 w/e 22/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E105
Works Number 3719
To Service During 04/1918
Taken into Stock 28/06/1924
Withdrawal Fri 30/10/1959 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 41 yrs, 6 mths , 29 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   12/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton 24/06/1924
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 11/07/1924
ARD Ardsley 05/02/1925
MEX Mexborough 10/08/1926
ANN Annesley 21/02/1929
WFD Woodford Halse 29/06/1947
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
CLK Colwick 28/03/1948
ANN Annesley 30/01/1949
38D Staveley (G.C.) 05/02/1950
38A Colwick 01/01/1956
   Withdrawn 30/10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse 29/06/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 03/04/1948
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 05/02/1949
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 28/01/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1143)
16/11/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1854)
27/08/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1865)
19/01/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 931)
10/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1367)
10/10/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
03/12/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3201)
23/11/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3211)
08/05/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1883)
07/10/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3288)
14/09/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3316)
22/01/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1039)
05/05/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22184)
26/09/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22156)
19/11/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22161)
12/07/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22889)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 26/04/1924 28/06/1924 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6349
 
Gorton Works 10/09/1927 22/10/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 05/10/1929 16/11/1929 43 days General
Boiler number 1854 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/08/1932 27/08/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1865 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/01/1935 19/01/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 931 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1936 10/10/1936 8 days General
Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1938 03/12/1938 8 days General
Boiler number 3201 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1940 23/11/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 3211 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 22/03/1943 08/05/1943 48 days General
Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/09/1944 07/10/1944 11 days General
Boiler number 3288 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1946 14/09/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3316 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1948 22/01/1949 23 days General
Boiler number 1039 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63694
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1951 05/05/1951 22 days General
Boiler number 22184 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/09/1953 26/09/1953 15 days General
Boiler number 22156 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1953 05/10/1953 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 22/10/1955 19/11/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 22161 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/10/1956 17/11/1956 29 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 29/06/1958 12/07/1958 14 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22889 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1959 26/10/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1675
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3719
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2915    
08/1921 Allocation      
26/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1924. Dep: 28/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6349
   
24/06/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
28/06/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
11/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
05/02/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
10/08/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
10/09/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1927. Dep: 22/10/1927.    
21/02/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
05/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1929. Dep: 16/11/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1854 (Diagram 15)
   
13/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1932. Dep: 27/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1865 (Diagram 15)
   
05/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1935. Dep: 19/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 931 (Diagram 15)
   
03/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1936. Dep: 10/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
26/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1938. Dep: 03/12/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3201 (Diagram 15)
   
09/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1940. Dep: 23/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3211 (Diagram 15)
   
22/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1943. Dep: 08/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15)
   
27/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3288 (Diagram 15)
   
24/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1946. Dep: 14/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3316 (Diagram 15)
   
05/01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3694    
29/06/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
28/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
31/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1948. Dep: 22/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1039 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63694
   
30/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
05/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
14/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1951. Dep: 05/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22184 (Diagram 15)
   
12/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1953. Dep: 26/09/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22156 (Diagram 15)
   
29/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/09/1953. Dep: 05/10/1953.    
22/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1955. Dep: 19/11/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22161 (Diagram 15)
   
01/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
20/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/10/1956. Dep: 17/11/1956.    
29/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/06/1958. Dep: 12/07/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22889 (Diagram 15)
   
26/10/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 26/10/1959. Dep: 26/10/1959.    
30/10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63694 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev