|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/02/1924 | 22/03/1924 | 50 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6340 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/11/1925 | 09/01/1926 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1093 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/03/1928 | 21/04/1928 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1930 | 14/06/1930 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1687 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1932 | 03/12/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1870 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/06/1935 | 08/06/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1287 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/05/1937 | 12/06/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1853 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1939 | 02/09/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1456 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1940 | 25/05/1940 | 22 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 16/09/1941 | 27/09/1941 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 3276 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1676 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3720 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
02/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 22/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6340 |
||
22/03/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
29/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
08/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
04/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
09/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
28/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1925. Dep: 09/01/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1093 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1928. Dep: 21/04/1928. | ||
10/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1930. Dep: 14/06/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1687 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1932. Dep: 03/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1870 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1935. Dep: 08/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1287 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1937. Dep: 12/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1853 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1939. Dep: 02/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1456 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/05/1940. Dep: 25/05/1940. | ||
16/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1941. Dep: 27/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3276 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/10/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 754 from Immingham (IMM) | ||
05/10/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 754 |