Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 942 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 5073 Week
» 15243 Month
» 293039 Year
» 1177420 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1677 m/e 05/1918
LNER (1924) 6496   19/09/1925
LNER (1946) 3695   02/06/1946
BR 63695 w/e 29/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E105
Works Number 3721
To Service During 05/1918
Taken into Stock 19/09/1925
Withdrawal Sun 09/12/1962 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 44 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 7/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 19/09/1925
NWE New England 25/09/1925
ANN Annesley 26/01/1933
WFD Woodford Halse 07/05/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 07/04/1946
CLK Colwick 27/10/1946
ANN Annesley 04/07/1948
39A Gorton 02/07/1950
39B Sheffield Darnall 13/06/1954
   Withdrawn 09/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 02/07/1950
ALLOC 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 19/06/1954
WDN   09/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1743)
10/12/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1850)
02/05/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1259)
31/12/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1201)
21/01/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1059)
04/01/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1883)
20/03/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3223)
12/06/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 930)
19/01/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1131)
29/05/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3390)
17/06/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3407)
20/12/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22883)
08/10/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22892)
13/12/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22117)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 06/06/1925 19/09/1925 106 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6496
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1927 12/11/1927 36 days General  
Gorton Works 22/02/1930 29/03/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 03/12/1932 10/12/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1850 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1935 02/05/1935 62 days General
Boiler number 1259 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/12/1936 31/12/1936 13 days General
Boiler number 1201 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/01/1939 21/01/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1059 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1940 04/01/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 16/02/1943 20/03/1943 33 days General
Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 19/05/1943 12/06/1943 25 days Heavy
Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/12/1945 19/01/1946 29 days General
Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/05/1948 29/05/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3390 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63695
 
Gorton Works 03/06/1950 17/06/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 3407 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1951 21/12/1951 2 days Light Casual
Tender changed
 
Gorton Works 29/11/1952 20/12/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22883 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1954 25/09/1954 22 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 03/09/1955 08/10/1955 36 days General
Boiler number 22892 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/11/1958 13/12/1958 29 days General
Boiler number 22117 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1677
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3721
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
06/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1925. Dep: 19/09/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6496
   
19/09/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
19/09/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
25/09/1925 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
08/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1927. Dep: 12/11/1927.    
22/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1930. Dep: 29/03/1930.    
03/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1932. Dep: 10/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1850 (Diagram 15)
   
26/01/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
02/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1935. Dep: 02/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1259 (Diagram 15)
   
19/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1936. Dep: 31/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1201 (Diagram 15)
   
07/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1939. Dep: 21/01/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1059 (Diagram 15)
   
21/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1940. Dep: 04/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1883 (Diagram 15)
   
16/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1943. Dep: 20/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 15)
   
19/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy) - Arr: 19/05/1943. Dep: 12/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15)
   
07/05/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
22/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1945. Dep: 19/01/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15)
   
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
02/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3695    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
08/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1948. Dep: 29/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3390 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63695
   
04/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
03/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1950. Dep: 17/06/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3407 (Diagram 15)
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
20/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/12/1951. Dep: 21/12/1951.
Work undertaken:
Tender changed
   
29/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1952. Dep: 20/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22883 (Diagram 15)
   
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B)    
15/08/1954 Sightings Gorton Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works. RO 9/1954 Link
04/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/09/1954. Dep: 25/09/1954.    
03/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1955. Dep: 08/10/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22892 (Diagram 15)
   
15/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1958. Dep: 13/12/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22117 (Diagram 15)
   
09/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63695 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev