Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 127 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 5936 Week
» 13120 Month
» 321101 Year
» 1205482 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1678 m/e 05/1918
LNER (1924) 6323   23/02/1924
LNER (1946) 3696   14/12/1946
BR 63696 w/e 19/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E105
Works Number 3722
To Service During 05/1918
Taken into Stock 23/02/1924
Withdrawal Fri 24/04/1959 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 40 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 05/03/1924
ANN Annesley 04/04/1924
FRO Frodingham 28/09/1939
   Withdrawn 24/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   24/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1262)
21/02/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1274)
19/04/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 487)
02/07/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1856)
01/12/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1335)
19/09/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
19/09/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1009)
05/11/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3350)
21/12/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3238)
09/10/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1153)
19/03/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3345)
21/07/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22198)
24/10/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22157)
05/05/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22171)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 09/02/1924 23/02/1924 15 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6323
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1924 21/02/1925 78 days General
Boiler number 1274 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1928 03/03/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 29/03/1930 19/04/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 487 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/06/1932 02/07/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1856 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/11/1934 01/12/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1335 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/08/1936 19/09/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 1009 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1938 05/11/1938 8 days General
Boiler number 3350 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1940 21/12/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 3238 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1943 09/10/1943 17 days General
Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/11/1946 14/12/1946 29 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3696
 
Gorton Works 26/02/1949 19/03/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 3345 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63696
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1951 21/07/1951 36 days General
Boiler number 22198 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/07/1951 25/07/1951 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 10/10/1953 24/10/1953 15 days General
Boiler number 22157 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/11/1953 14/11/1953 14 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 20/11/1953 22/11/1953 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 07/04/1956 05/05/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 22171 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/04/1959 17/04/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1678
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3722
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 23/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6323
   
23/02/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
05/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
04/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
06/12/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1924. Dep: 21/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1274 (Diagram 15)
   
21/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1928. Dep: 03/03/1928.    
29/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1930. Dep: 19/04/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 487 (Diagram 15)
   
18/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1932. Dep: 02/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1856 (Diagram 15)
   
24/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1934. Dep: 01/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1335 (Diagram 15)
   
29/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1936. Dep: 19/09/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1009 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
29/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1938. Dep: 05/11/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3350 (Diagram 15)
   
28/09/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
14/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1940. Dep: 21/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3238 (Diagram 15)
   
23/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1943. Dep: 09/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15)
   
16/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1946. Dep: 14/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3696
   
26/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1949. Dep: 19/03/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3345 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63696
   
16/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1951. Dep: 21/07/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22198 (Diagram 15)
   
24/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/07/1951. Dep: 25/07/1951.    
10/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1953. Dep: 24/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22157 (Diagram 15)
   
01/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/11/1953. Dep: 14/11/1953.    
20/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/11/1953. Dep: 22/11/1953.    
07/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1956. Dep: 05/05/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22171 (Diagram 15)
   
17/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 17/04/1959. Dep: 17/04/1959.    
24/04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63696 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev