Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 125 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 2264 Week
» 12434 Month
» 290230 Year
» 1174611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1679 m/e 06/1918
LNWR 2972 m/e 06/1920
LNER (1924) 6338   14/06/1924
LNER (1946) 3697   14/09/1946
BR 63697 w/e 08/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1918
O4/803/05/1958
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E105
Works Number 3723
To Service During 06/1918
Taken into Stock 14/06/1924
Withdrawal Sun 29/08/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield)
Service Life 47 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Garnham, Harris & Elton, Chesterfield, 10/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   06/1920
GOR Gorton 12/06/1924
CLK Colwick 03/02/1926
DON Doncaster 23/01/1944
WFD Woodford Halse 07/09/1944
LNG Langwith Junction 07/04/1946
DON Doncaster 27/10/1946
BRN Barnsley 08/01/1950
41J Langwith Junction 29/11/1959
   Withdrawn 29/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC BRN Barnsley w/e 14/01/1950
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   w/e 29/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 514)
29/07/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1676)
28/10/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1223)
02/03/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1254)
19/06/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3296)
25/11/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3272)
17/01/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1006)
25/03/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1232)
14/09/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1006)
08/01/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 805)
21/07/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22200)
04/09/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22262)
03/05/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28893)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 30/05/1924 14/06/1924 16 days Heavy
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6338
 
Gorton Works 30/09/1925 05/11/1925 37 days General  
Gorton Works 14/10/1927 22/11/1927 40 days General  
Gorton Works 14/06/1930 29/07/1930 46 days General
Boiler number 1676 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1932 28/10/1932 42 days General
Boiler number 1223 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/01/1935 02/03/1935 36 days General
Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/05/1937 19/06/1937 46 days General
Boiler number 3296 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/11/1939 25/11/1939 14 days General
Boiler number 3272 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1941 17/01/1942 21 days General
Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1944 25/03/1944 25 days General
Boiler number 1232 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1946 14/09/1946 47 days General
Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3697
 
Gorton Works 13/11/1948 08/01/1949 57 days General
Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63697
 
Gorton Works 13/06/1951 21/07/1951 39 days General
Boiler number 22200 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1954 04/09/1954 33 days General
Boiler number 22262 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1958 03/05/1958 55 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28893 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 28/04/1961 25/05/1961 28 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 21/06/1962 09/08/1962 50 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1679
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3723
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
06/1920 Allocation      
06/1920 Renumbered Renumbered to 2972    
30/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 30/05/1924. Dep: 14/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6338
   
12/06/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/06/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
30/09/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1925. Dep: 05/11/1925.    
03/02/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
14/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1927. Dep: 22/11/1927.    
14/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1930. Dep: 29/07/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1676 (Diagram 15)
   
17/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1932. Dep: 28/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1223 (Diagram 15)
   
26/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1935. Dep: 02/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15)
   
05/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1937. Dep: 19/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3296 (Diagram 15)
   
12/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1939. Dep: 25/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3272 (Diagram 15)
   
28/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1941. Dep: 17/01/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
01/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1944. Dep: 25/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1232 (Diagram 15)
   
07/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
30/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1946. Dep: 14/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3697
   
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
13/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1948. Dep: 08/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 805 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63697
   
08/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
13/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1951. Dep: 21/07/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22200 (Diagram 15)
   
03/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1954. Dep: 04/09/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22262 (Diagram 15)
   
15/08/1954 Sightings Gorton Works visit: Around the works. RO 9/1954 Link
10/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1958. Dep: 03/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28893 (Diagram 100A)
   
29/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
28/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/04/1961. Dep: 25/05/1961.    
21/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/06/1962. Dep: 09/08/1962.    
29/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63697 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev