Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 990 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 6137 Week
» 16307 Month
» 294103 Year
» 1178484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1680 m/e 06/1918
LNER (1924) 6322   10/04/1924
War Dept. 752   19/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E105
Works Number 3724
To Service During 06/1918
Taken into Stock 10/04/1924
Withdrawal Fri 19/09/1941 off Colwick (CLK)
Service Life 23 yrs, 3 mths , 19 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 752 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 10/04/1924
CLK Colwick 13/12/1924
   Withdrawn 19/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1381)
10/12/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 822)
07/01/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1176)
20/10/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1290)
06/02/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1104)
26/08/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3280)
27/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1873)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 05/04/1924 10/04/1924 6 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6322
 
Gorton Works 28/06/1924 13/12/1924 169 days General  
Gorton Works 12/11/1927 10/12/1927 29 days General
Boiler number 822 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1930 31/05/1930 29 days General  
Gorton Works 24/12/1932 07/01/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1176 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1934 20/10/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1290 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/01/1937 06/02/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 1104 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1939 26/08/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3280 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1941 27/09/1941 12 days General
Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 752
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1680
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3724
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
05/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 10/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6322
   
10/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
10/04/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
28/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1924. Dep: 13/12/1924.    
13/12/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
12/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1927. Dep: 10/12/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 822 (Diagram 15)
   
03/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1930. Dep: 31/05/1930.    
24/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1932. Dep: 07/01/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1176 (Diagram 15)
   
13/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1934. Dep: 20/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1290 (Diagram 15)
   
30/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1937. Dep: 06/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1104 (Diagram 15)
   
12/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1939. Dep: 26/08/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3280 (Diagram 15)
   
16/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1941. Dep: 27/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 752
   
19/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 752 from Colwick (CLK)    

prev prev