|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/04/1924 | 10/04/1924 | 6 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6322 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/06/1924 | 13/12/1924 | 169 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1927 | 10/12/1927 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 822 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1930 | 31/05/1930 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/12/1932 | 07/01/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1176 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1934 | 20/10/1934 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1290 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/01/1937 | 06/02/1937 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1104 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1939 | 26/08/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3280 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/09/1941 | 27/09/1941 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 752 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1680 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3724 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
05/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 10/04/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6322 |
||
10/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
10/04/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
28/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1924. Dep: 13/12/1924. | ||
13/12/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
12/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1927. Dep: 10/12/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 822 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1930. Dep: 31/05/1930. | ||
24/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1932. Dep: 07/01/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1176 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1934. Dep: 20/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1290 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1937. Dep: 06/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1104 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1939. Dep: 26/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3280 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1941. Dep: 27/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 752 |
||
19/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 752 from Colwick (CLK) |