Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 351 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 351 Week
» 17687 Month
» 295483 Year
» 1179864 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1682 m/e 06/1918
LNWR 2973 m/e 06/1920
LNER (1924) 6337   12/07/1924
LNER (1946) 3699   15/09/1946
BR 63699 w/e 28/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1918
O4/712/04/1941
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E105
Works Number 3726
To Service During 06/1918
Taken into Stock 12/07/1924
Withdrawal Mon 08/06/1959 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 41 yrs , 8 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
91LNWR (on loan)   06/1920
GOR Gorton 08/07/1924
LNG Langwith Junction 25/02/1945
CLK Colwick 27/10/1946
ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
38A Colwick 08/10/1950
38B Annesley 30/09/1951
38A Colwick 04/11/1951
   Withdrawn 08/06/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley 12/10/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 06/10/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 10/11/1951
WDN   08/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1166)
24/11/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1882)
09/08/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1106)
09/07/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1414)
16/06/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1053)
21/03/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1941)
17/09/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3252)
12/04/1941 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3678)
15/05/1943 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3659)
04/11/1944 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3669)
21/06/1947 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3687)
28/05/1949 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3658)
02/08/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22337)
12/06/1954 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22322)
01/12/1956 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22324)
03/05/1958 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22336)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 26/04/1924 12/07/1924 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6337
 
Gorton Works 01/05/1926 24/07/1926 85 days General  
Gorton Works 11/08/1928 24/11/1928 106 days General
Boiler number 1882 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/07/1930 09/08/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1106 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1932 09/07/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1414 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1934 16/06/1934 8 days General
Boiler number 1053 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/03/1936 21/03/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1938 17/09/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 3252 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1941 12/04/1941 22 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3678 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1942 28/03/1942 13 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 01/05/1943 15/05/1943 15 days General
Boiler number 3659 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 14/10/1944 04/11/1944 22 days General
Boiler number 3669 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 27/04/1946 04/05/1946 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 17/05/1947 21/06/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 3687 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1949 28/05/1949 15 days General
Boiler number 3658 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63699
 
Gorton Works 06/01/1951 27/01/1951 22 days General  
Gorton Works 05/07/1952 02/08/1952 29 days General
Boiler number 22337 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1952 08/08/1952 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 18/04/1953 25/04/1953 8 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 05/06/1954 12/06/1954 8 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22322 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 23/04/1955 21/05/1955 29 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 20/10/1956 01/12/1956 43 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22324 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 22/05/1957 08/06/1957 18 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 22/03/1958 03/05/1958 43 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22336 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 26/05/1959 26/05/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1682
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3726
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
06/1920 Allocation      
06/1920 Renumbered Renumbered to 2973    
26/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1924. Dep: 12/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6337
   
08/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
12/07/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
01/05/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1926. Dep: 24/07/1926.    
11/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1928. Dep: 24/11/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1882 (Diagram 15)
   
19/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1930. Dep: 09/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1106 (Diagram 15)
   
25/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1932. Dep: 09/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1414 (Diagram 15)
   
09/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1934. Dep: 16/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1053 (Diagram 15)
   
07/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1936. Dep: 21/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15)
   
20/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1938. Dep: 17/09/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3252 (Diagram 15)
   
22/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1941. Dep: 12/04/1941.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3678 (Diagram 15D)
   
16/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/03/1942. Dep: 28/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
01/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1943. Dep: 15/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3659 (Diagram 15D)
   
14/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1944. Dep: 04/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3669 (Diagram 15D)
   
25/02/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
27/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/04/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946.    
15/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3699    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
17/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1947. Dep: 21/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3687 (Diagram 15D)
   
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
14/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1949. Dep: 28/05/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3658 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63699
   
08/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
06/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1951. Dep: 27/01/1951.    
30/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
04/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
05/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1952. Dep: 02/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22337 (Diagram 15D)
   
05/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1952. Dep: 08/08/1952.    
18/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/04/1953. Dep: 25/04/1953.    
05/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 05/06/1954. Dep: 12/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22322 (Diagram 15D)
   
23/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 23/04/1955. Dep: 21/05/1955.    
20/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/10/1956. Dep: 01/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22324 (Diagram 15D)
   
22/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/05/1957. Dep: 08/06/1957.    
22/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/03/1958. Dep: 03/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22336 (Diagram 15D)
   
26/05/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 26/05/1959. Dep: 26/05/1959.    
08/06/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63699 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev