Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 464 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1803 Week
» 31301 Month
» 368147 Year
» 1589712 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1683 m/e 07/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6497   14/11/1925
War Dept. 706   13/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E105
Works Number 3727
To Service During 07/1918
Taken into Stock 14/11/1925
Withdrawal Sat 13/09/1941 off Colwick (CLK)
Service Life 23 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 706 and sent to the Middle Easi via Birkenhead, 19/9/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1918
GOR Gorton on 12/11/1925
CLK Colwick on 08/01/1926
   Withdrawn on 13/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1059)
30/01/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1015)
30/06/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1149)
01/08/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1032)
01/08/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
25/03/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 803)
02/08/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 932)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/08/1925 14/11/1925 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6497
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1929 22/06/1929 43 days General  
Gorton Works 16/01/1932 30/01/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1015 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1934 30/06/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/07/1936 01/08/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1032 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 18/03/1939 25/03/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 803 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/07/1941 02/08/1941 13 days General
Boiler number 932 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1683
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3727
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
22/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1925. Dep: 14/11/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6497
   
12/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/11/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
08/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
11/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1929. Dep: 22/06/1929.    
16/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1932. Dep: 30/01/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1015 (Diagram 15)
   
16/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1934. Dep: 30/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15)
   
18/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1936. Dep: 01/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1032 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
18/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1939. Dep: 25/03/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 803 (Diagram 15)
   
21/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1941. Dep: 02/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 932 (Diagram 15)
   
13/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 706 from Colwick (CLK)    
13/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 706    

prev prev