|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 04/04/1925 | 09/07/1925 | 97 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6498 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/11/1928 | 21/12/1928 | 49 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 04/11/1931 | 27/01/1931 | -280 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/09/1932 | 22/10/1932 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 1002 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/12/1935 | 01/02/1936 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/06/1938 | 13/08/1938 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/10/1940 | 23/11/1940 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 20/12/1942 | 27/02/1943 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 1275 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/06/1945 | 18/08/1945 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 3425 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/09/1947 | 14/11/1947 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/08/1950 | 23/09/1950 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 22108 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63701 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1953 | 28/02/1953 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 22140 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/12/1956 | 26/01/1957 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 22240 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/06/1961 | 24/08/1961 | 81 days | General | Boiler number 22194 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1684 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3728 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
04/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1925. Dep: 09/07/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6498 |
||
09/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
09/07/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
21/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
11/01/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
03/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1928. Dep: 21/12/1928. | ||
01/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
27/01/1931 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 1944 boiler fitted | ||
25/10/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
04/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1931. Dep: 27/01/1931. | ||
08/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1932. Dep: 22/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1002 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1935. Dep: 01/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
21/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1938. Dep: 13/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1940. Dep: 23/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/03/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
20/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1942. Dep: 27/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1275 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1945. Dep: 18/08/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3425 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3701 | ||
20/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1947. Dep: 14/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1950. Dep: 23/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22108 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63701 |
||
28/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
03/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
03/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1953. Dep: 28/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22140 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1956. Dep: 26/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22240 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1961. Dep: 24/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22194 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/02/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
01/08/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63701 from Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
29/11/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |