Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. (ROD) 1684 m/e 07/1918
LNER (1924) 6498   09/07/1925
LNER (1946) 3701   19/05/1946
BR 63701 w/e 30/09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E105
Works Number 3728
To Service During 07/1918
Taken into Stock 09/07/1925
Withdrawal Sun 01/08/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Scrapping Mon 29/11/1965 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 47 yrs, 1 mth , 2 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to A Draper, Hull 9/65. Cut up 29/11/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 09/07/1925
DON Doncaster 21/07/1925
NWE New England 11/01/1926
MAR March 01/03/1929
CAM Cambridge 25/10/1931
MAR March 16/03/1942
36B Mexborough 28/10/1951
41H Staveley (G.C.) 11/02/1962
41J Langwith Junction 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn 01/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 5w/e 10/03/1962
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 01/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1193)
27/01/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1944)
22/10/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1002)
01/02/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
01/02/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1949)
13/08/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1062)
23/11/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3242)
27/02/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1275)
18/08/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3425)
14/11/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 949)
23/09/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22108)
28/02/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22140)
26/01/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22240)
24/08/1961 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22194)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 04/04/1925 09/07/1925 97 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6498
 
Gorton Works 03/11/1928 21/12/1928 49 days General  
Gorton Works 04/11/1931 27/01/1931 -280 days General  
Gorton Works 08/09/1932 22/10/1932 45 days General
Boiler number 1002 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/12/1935 01/02/1936 48 days General
Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 21/06/1938 13/08/1938 54 days General
Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1940 23/11/1940 26 days General
Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 20/12/1942 27/02/1943 70 days General
Boiler number 1275 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/06/1945 18/08/1945 70 days General
Boiler number 3425 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/09/1947 14/11/1947 56 days General
Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/08/1950 23/09/1950 34 days General
Boiler number 22108 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63701
 
Gorton Works 03/02/1953 28/02/1953 26 days General
Boiler number 22140 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1956 26/01/1957 41 days General
Boiler number 22240 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1961 24/08/1961 81 days General
Boiler number 22194 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1684
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3728
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
04/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1925. Dep: 09/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6498
   
09/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/07/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
21/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
11/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
03/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1928. Dep: 21/12/1928.    
01/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
27/01/1931 Modification Diagram 15 number 1944 boiler fitted    
25/10/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
04/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1931. Dep: 27/01/1931.    
08/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1932. Dep: 22/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1002 (Diagram 15)
   
16/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1935. Dep: 01/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
21/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1938. Dep: 13/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15)
   
29/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1940. Dep: 23/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 15)
   
16/03/1942 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
20/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1942. Dep: 27/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1275 (Diagram 15)
   
10/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1945. Dep: 18/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3425 (Diagram 15)
   
19/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3701    
20/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1947. Dep: 14/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 949 (Diagram 15)
   
21/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1950. Dep: 23/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22108 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63701
   
28/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
03/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1953. Dep: 28/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22140 (Diagram 15)
   
17/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1956. Dep: 26/01/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22240 (Diagram 15)
   
05/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1961. Dep: 24/08/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22194 (Diagram 15)
   
11/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
01/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63701 from Langwith Junction (41J)    
29/11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev