Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1283 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7672 Week
» 28114 Month
» 364960 Year
» 1586525 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1685 m/e 07/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6321   29/03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3702   06/04/1946
British Railways 63702 w/e 15/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E105
Works Number 3729
To Service During 07/1918
Taken into Stock 29/03/1924
Withdrawal Sat 19/09/1964 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Scrapping Tue 16/03/1965 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 46 yrs, 2 mths , 20 dys

Notes
Notes The shopping dates between 1927 and 1943 are derived from Tender Shop records
Sold for scrap to A Draper, Hull 11/64. Cut up 16/3/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1918
GOR Gorton on 29/03/1924
CLK Colwick on 05/04/1924
NWE New England on 27/11/1925
GRA Grantham on 08/12/1933
NWE New England on 29/12/1933
MAR March on 19/10/1935
ANN Annesley on 21/12/1935
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) on 25/11/1940
WFD Woodford Halse on 31/01/1943
GOR Gorton on 10/03/1943
DON Doncaster on 22/05/1945
GOR Gorton on 25/06/1945
FRO Frodingham on 04/11/1945
STV Staveley (G.C.) on 14/04/1946
38B Annesley on 08/10/1950
39A Gorton on 26/11/1950
38D Staveley (G.C.) on 17/02/1952
41F Mexborough on 31/01/1960
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 26/11/1961
   Withdrawn on 19/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FRO Frodingham m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 23/02/1952
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 5w/e 09/12/1961
WDN   3w/e 04/05/1964
WDN   on 19/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1359)
07/12/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1335)
07/01/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1143)
04/06/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1125)
07/09/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1878)
07/07/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 811)
07/08/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1949)
07/08/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 804)
21/08/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 946)
06/04/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3323)
18/05/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3429)
05/08/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3410)
16/08/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22285)
11/09/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22276)
13/10/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22206)
14/10/1960 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22214)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 1924 12/1924   General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6321
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1924 29/03/1924 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 1927 06/08/1927   General  
Gorton Works 1930 01/1930   General  
Gorton Works 07/1932 04/06/1932   General  
Gorton Works 14/08/1934 09/1934   General  
Gorton Works 25/06/1936 07/1936   General  
Gorton Works 12/08/1938 08/1938   General  
Gorton Works 06/08/1940 08/1940   General  
Gorton Works 08/08/1943 21/08/1943 14 days General
Boiler number 946 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1944 06/01/1945 36 days General  
Gorton Works 27/02/1946 06/04/1946 39 days General
Boiler number 3323 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3702
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1948 18/05/1948 37 days General
Boiler number 3429 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63702
 
Gorton Works 19/06/1950 05/08/1950 48 days General
Boiler number 3410 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/07/1952 16/08/1952 20 days General
Boiler number 22285 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1954 11/09/1954 39 days General
Boiler number 22276 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/08/1956 13/10/1956 44 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22206 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1957 24/08/1957 27 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 09/09/1960 14/10/1960 36 days General
Boiler number 22214 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1685
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3729
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 00/00/1924. Dep: 00/12/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6321
   
22/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/03/1924. Dep: 29/03/1924.    
29/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
29/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
05/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
07/12/1924 Modification Diagram 15 number 1335 boiler fitted    
27/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 00/00/1927. Dep: 06/08/1927.    
1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 00/00/1930. Dep: 00/01/1930.    
07/01/1930 Modification Diagram 15 number 1143 boiler fitted    
04/06/1932 Modification Diagram 15 number 1125 boiler fitted    
07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 00/07/1932. Dep: 04/06/1932.    
08/12/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
29/12/1933 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
14/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1934. Dep: 00/09/1934.    
07/09/1934 Modification Diagram 15 number 1878 boiler fitted    
19/10/1935 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
21/12/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
25/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1936. Dep: 00/07/1936.    
07/07/1936 Modification Diagram 15 number 811 boiler fitted    
07/08/1938 Modification Diagram 15 number 1949 boiler fitted    
12/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1938. Dep: 00/08/1938.    
06/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1940. Dep: 00/08/1940.    
07/08/1940 Modification Diagram 15 number 804 boiler fitted    
25/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
31/01/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
10/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
08/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1943. Dep: 21/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 946 (Diagram 15)
   
02/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1944. Dep: 06/01/1945.    
22/05/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
04/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
27/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1946. Dep: 06/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3323 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3702
   
14/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
12/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1948. Dep: 18/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3429 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63702
   
19/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1950. Dep: 05/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3410 (Diagram 15)
   
08/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
17/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
28/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1952. Dep: 16/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22285 (Diagram 15)
   
04/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1954. Dep: 11/09/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22276 (Diagram 15)
   
31/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 31/08/1956. Dep: 13/10/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22206 (Diagram 15)
   
29/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 29/07/1957. Dep: 24/08/1957.    
31/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
09/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1960. Dep: 14/10/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22214 (Diagram 15)
   
26/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
19/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63702 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev